Traylor v. Wilson
Plaintiff: Carlos Traylor
Defendant: Heather Wilson
Case Number: 1:2018cv04285
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Orinda D Evans
Referring Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Heather Wilson filed by Carlos Traylor.(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 19, 2018 Filing 16 Certificate of Compliance with the Court's Standing Order by Carlos Traylor. (jtj)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Standing Order: Guidelines to Parties and Counsel Proceeding Before the Honorable Amy Totenberg. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto.To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 10/17/2018. (jtj)
October 17, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Carlos Traylor re #15 Order. (jtj)
October 12, 2018 Filing 14 Electronic Summons Issued as to Heather Wilson, US Attorney General and US Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Heather Wilson Summons, #2 United States Attorney Summons) (jtj)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Reopen Case. The Clerk is directed to reopen this case, accept the Amended Complaint for filing and update the case caption to identify that Heather Wilson is being sued only in her official capacity as Secretary of the Air Force. In light of the fact that Plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis and pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(d) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3), the Clerk is further directed to prepare copies of the summons and Amended Complaint, forward copies of these documents, by registered or certified mail to: (1) the civil process clerk at the United States Attorneys Office for the Northern District of Georgia; (2) the Attorney General of the United States at Washington, D.C. and (3) Dr. Heather Wilson, Secretary of the Air Force, 1670 Air Fore Pentagon, Washington, DC 20330-1670. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 10/12/2018. (jtj)
October 12, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Carlos Traylor re #13 Order. Heather Wilson, United States Attorney's Office for the Northern District of Georgia, and the Attorney General of the United States mailed a copy of the order, amended complaint and summons by certified mail. AG: 9171999991703257214717, Heather Wilson: 9171999991703257214731, US Atty: 9171999991703257214724 (jtj)
October 11, 2018 Submission of #10 MOTION to Reopen Case with Amended Complaint, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (jtj)
October 10, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Reopen Case with Amended Complaint by Carlos Traylor. (jtj)
October 9, 2018 Filing 12 Amended Complaint by Carlos Traylor. (sap) Modified on 10/12/2018 to reflect e-filed document. (jtj)
October 5, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits O and P by Carlos Traylor. (sap)
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - This civil action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. (jtj)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING this civil action WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. In the event Plaintiff seeks to refile his claim(s), he is directed to carefully review his factual allegations and determine whether he is challenging the August 6, 2017 AFBCMR "final" denial pursuant to the APA or, in the alternative, whether he is challenging the AFBCMR's failure to render a final decision in his case in the first instance. The Complaint should be modified accordingly based upon Plaintiffs decision in this regard. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 10/05/2018. (jtj)
October 5, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (jtj)
October 5, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Carlos Traylor re #9 Clerk's Judgment, #8 Order. (jtj)
September 20, 2018 Submission of #3 Complaint to District Judge Amy Totenberg for a Frivolity Review. (sap)
September 19, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Carlos Traylor re #4 Order Reassigning Case and the NEF. (sap)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Carlos Traylor (sap)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits M and N by Carlos Traylor (sap)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Carlos Traylor. (sap)
September 18, 2018 Submission of #5 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (sap)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Amy Totenberg for all further proceedings. Judge Orinda D. Evans no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:18-cv-04285-AT. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 9/18/2018. (sap)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Carlos Traylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(klb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is further ORDERED that service of process shall not issue at this time. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this case to the District Court for a frivolity determination pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 9/13/18. (klb)
September 13, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Carlos Traylor re #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (klb)
September 13, 2018 Submission of #3 Complaint, for frivolity review, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (klb)
September 12, 2018 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (ddm)
September 12, 2018 Submission of #1 Complaint for review, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (ddm)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carlos Traylor. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Traylor v. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Traylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?