Fillion v. Endeavor Air, Inc.

Plaintiff: Emmanuel Fillion
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc. and Endeavor Air, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv04416
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: Georgia Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER granting #9 Motion to Substitute Party. Endeavor Air, Inc. is substituted for defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/15/18. (jpa)
November 14, 2018 10 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): December 21, 2018-January 3, 2019; January 28-30, 2019; March 12-15, 2019; March 27-29, 2019; April 1-9, 2019; and May 1-7, 2019 by Nicole Wolfe Stout. (Stout, Nicole)
November 14, 2018 9 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Consent Order)(Walker, Courtney)
November 14, 2018 8 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Stout, Nicole)
October 16, 2018 7 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. Discovery ends on 3/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(Stout, Nicole) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 3, 2018 6 Return of Service Executed. Delta Air Lines, Inc. served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Mitchell, Richard) Text modified on 10/4/2018 (jkl).
September 26, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Extended Leave of Absence for March 7, 2019 through April 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/25/2018. (jkl)
September 25, 2018 Clerks Notation re #4 Leave of Absence March 7, 2019 through April 4, 2019, by Richard C. Mitchell. Judge Thrash will not require an appearance by R. Mitchell on these dates. (ss)
September 24, 2018 4 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 7, 2019 through April 4, 2019, by Richard C. Mitchell. (Mitchell, Richard) Modified on 9/25/2018 per direction of Chambers (jkl).
September 24, 2018 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons. OK, per TWT. (ss)
September 21, 2018 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Emmanuel Fillion. (O'Connor, Patrick)
September 20, 2018 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Delta Air Lines, Inc. (aaq)
September 20, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Emmanuel Fillion. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8159733) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaq) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fillion v. Endeavor Air, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Fillion
Represented By: Patrick Joseph O'Connor
Represented By: Richard C. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney Broussard Walker
Represented By: Nicole Wolfe Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endeavor Air, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?