Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Ross et al

Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Alonzo Ross and P & K Restaurant Enterprise, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv04554
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Julie Cohen Lonstein. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/1/18. (jpa)
November 1, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Julie Cohen Lonstein Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Julie Cohen Lonstein added appearing on behalf of Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (pmb)
October 25, 2018 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Julie Cohen Lonstein Pro Hac Vice by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bar Admission List, #2 Exhibit Attachment to Application, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Wehunt, J. Marshall)
October 11, 2018 RETURN of #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Julie Cohen Lonstein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8188400) to attorney for correction re: signatures. (pmb)
October 5, 2018 Refund in the amount of $400.00 has been processed, effective 10/05/18 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE Of Filing by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. re #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Julie Cohen Lonstein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8188400) Certificate of Good Standing (Wehunt, J. Marshall)
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Julie Cohen Lonstein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8188400)by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bar Admission List, #2 Exhibit List of Cases)(Wehunt, J. Marshall)
October 2, 2018 Clerks Approval re Application for Refund of Fees paid online, #9 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number 113E-8177760. (jpa)
October 1, 2018 Clerks Notation approving #3 CIP/CDS (bgt)
October 1, 2018 (See Document No. #2 ) Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number 113E-8177760. (tcc)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Filing by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Plaintiff's Responses to Mandatory Disclosures (Wehunt, J. Marshall)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED AO 121 . (Wehunt, J. Marshall)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Wehunt, J. Marshall)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 Redocketed at #9 NOTICE Of Filing by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Request for Refund (Wehunt, J. Marshall) Modified on 10/2/2018 (jpa).
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to P & K Restaurant Enterprise, LLC. (via registered agent). (tcc)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to P & K Restaurant Enterprise, LLC. (tcc)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Alonzo Ross. (tcc)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8177760) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Ross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Represented By: J. Marshall "Buzz&quot Wehunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alonzo Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P & K Restaurant Enterprise, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?