United States of America v. $18,740.00 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $18,740.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 1:2018cv04586
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 11/04/2018. (Brown, Michael)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Juan Estrada (Brown, Michael)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America sent to Juan Estrada via Attorney Victor Serrano (Brown, Michael)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $18,740.00 in United States Currency. Arrested on 10/3/2018. (rjs)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM for $18,740.00 in United States Currency by United States of America. (rjs)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $18,740.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $18,740.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael John Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?