Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. United States Department of State

Plaintiff: Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: United States Department of State
Case Number: 1:2018cv04661
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have up to and including December 14, 2018, to file its responsive pleading in this case. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/14/2018. (rjs)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by United States Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manship, Flora)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. United States Department of State served on 10/17/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service - U.S. Department of State, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service - U.S. Attorney General, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service - U.S. Attorney NDGA)(Hermann, Kimberly)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (eop)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Attorney's Office. (eop)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jeff Sessions. (eop)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Department of State, Michael Pompeo. (eop)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8191148) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. United States Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Represented By: Flora Manship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Stewart Hermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?