Tommy Bahama Group, Inc. v. Obernesser LLC et al

Plaintiff: Tommy Bahama Group, Inc.
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc. and Obernesser LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv04708
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): October 26, 2018, December 20-24, 2018, February 1, 2019, March 18-April 5, 2019, by Alan E. Lubel. (Lubel, Alan)
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (jtj)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 Certificate of Compliance by Tommy Bahama Group, Inc. (Lubel, Alan)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order: Guidelines to Parties and Counsel Proceeding Before the Honorable Amy Totenberg. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto.To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Harry Martin, the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, is your principal point ofcontact on matters related to this case. Where possible, communications with Mr. Martin should be via email. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 10/11/2018. (jtj)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 First Certificate of Interested Persons by Tommy Bahama Group, Inc.. (Lubel, Alan)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED AO 121 . (Lubel, Alan)
October 11, 2018 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Amazon.com, Inc.. (eop)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Obernesser LLC. (eop)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Tommy Bahama Group, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8197896) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tommy Bahama Group, Inc. v. Obernesser LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Bahama Group, Inc.
Represented By: Alan E. Lubel
Represented By: Daniel H. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obernesser LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?