Southern Environmental Law Center v. Federal Aviation Administration

Plaintiff: Southern Environmental Law Center
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration
Case Number: 1:2018cv04763
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Referring Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons , as to Defendant Federal Aviation Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, FAA Packet Tracking, #2 Exhibit B, Pak Packet Tracking, #3 Exhibit C, Sessions Packet Tracking)(Gist, Brian)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Federal Aviation Administration's Answer due 12/21/2018. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/19/2018. (btql)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief In Support by Federal Aviation Administration. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Samuel)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/25/2018. (btql)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Leigh Martin May for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:18-cv-04763-LMM. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 10/22/2018. (tcc)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Southern Environmental Law Center. (Gist, Brian)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Federal Aviation Administration. (bdb)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Southern Environmental Law Center. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8206568) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Environmental Law Center v. Federal Aviation Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Environmental Law Center
Represented By: Brian Lawrence Gist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration
Represented By: Samuel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?