Swafford v. Fung Mei, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dustin Swafford
Defendant: Fung Mei, Inc. and Ramco Promenade LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv04790
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Consent Motion to File Answer: Defendants shall each have up to and including January 7, 2019 to file their Answer or other such defensive pleadings to Plaintiffs Complaint. Absent providential cause, no further extensions of time to Answer will be granted by the Court. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/7/2018. (rlb)
December 5, 2018 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Dustin Swafford. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ehrlich, Craig)
December 5, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Raanon Gal on behalf of Ramco Promenade LLC (Gal, Raanon)
December 5, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David Roland Hughes on behalf of Fung Mei, Inc. (Hughes, David)
December 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Fung Mei, Inc. Answer due 12/5/2018. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/7/18. (bnw)
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Defendant Fung Mei, Inc. by Dustin Swafford. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ehrlich, Craig)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Ramco Promenade LLC'S Answer due 12/5/2018. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/2/18. (jpa)
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Defendant Ramco Promenade LLC by Dustin Swafford. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ehrlich, Craig)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Dustin Swafford. Fung Mei, Inc. served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Ehrlich, Craig)
October 22, 2018 Clerks Notation approving #6 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. (bgt)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by Dustin Swafford. (Ehrlich, Craig)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Dustin Swafford. Ramco Promenade LLC served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (Ehrlich, Craig)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 10/17/18. (jpa)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ramco Promenade LLC. (eop)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Fung Mei, Inc.. (eop)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dustin Swafford. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8210462) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swafford v. Fung Mei, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fung Mei, Inc.
Represented By: David Roland Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramco Promenade LLC
Represented By: Raanon Gal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Swafford
Represented By: Craig J. Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?