Palast et al v. Kemp
Plaintiff: Helen Butler and Greg Palast
Defendant: Brian Kemp
Case Number: 1:2018cv04809
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 NEF regenerated for the #9 Scheduling Order (aaq)
December 11, 2018 Notification of Docket Correction re #9 Scheduling Order: Incorrect PDF uploaded. Correct document found at [9-1]. (cmd)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER re: #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/11/2018. (cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2018: #1 Corrected PDF) (cmd).
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Defendant's Initial Disclosures by Brian Kemp.(Belinfante, Joshua)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Brian Kemp. (Belinfante, Joshua)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Brian Kemp. Discovery ends on 4/8/2019.(Belinfante, Joshua) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 26, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorney Jeanne Ellen Mirer as to Helen Butler regarding #4 Order on Application for Admission PHV. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (mlb)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Jeanne Ellen Mirer. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/26/18. (mlb)
October 25, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeanne Ellen Mirer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8216126). Attorney Jeanne Ellen Mirer added appearing on behalf of Helen Butler, Greg Palast (pmb)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Greg Palast. Brian Kemp served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. (Spears, George)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeanne Ellen Mirer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8216126)by Greg Palast. (Spears, George)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brian Kemp. (cmd)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Greg Palast, Helen Butler. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8212981) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmd) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palast et al v. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kemp
Represented By: Joshua Barrett Belinfante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Butler
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Jeanne Ellen Mirer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Palast
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Jeanne Ellen Mirer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?