Callahan v. Emory Healthcare, Inc.

Plaintiff: Aiesha Callahan
Defendant: Emory Healthcare, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv04856
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: Georgia Northern District Court
0 Judge: Justin S Anand
1 Judge: William M Ray
2 Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER granting the parties' #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, through January 29, 2019, to respond to #3 Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 12/13/18. (ddm)
December 13, 2018 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Defendant's Responsive Pleading re: #3 Complaint, by Emory Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snelling, John)
November 16, 2018 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John Shiver Snelling on behalf of Emory Healthcare, Inc. (Snelling, John)
November 16, 2018 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Emory Healthcare, Inc.. Emory Healthcare, Inc. waiver mailed on 10/26/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Snelling, John)
November 14, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas F. Martin on behalf of Aiesha Callahan (Martin, Thomas)
November 6, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Aiesha Callahan re 11/6/18 Case Reassignment. (cmd)
November 6, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge William M. Ray II. Judge Eleanor L. Ross no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:18-cv-04856-WMR-JSA. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (cmd)
October 29, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Aiesha Callahan re #8 Order. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (jpa)
October 26, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER DENYING as moot #4 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 10/26/18. (jpa)
October 26, 2018 7 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE (incl. 1 SASE, #2 Service Order, #3 Complaint, #6 Initial Disclosures), mailed to Emory Healthcare, Inc. on 10/26/2018. If waiver not returned by 12/3/2018, prepare personal service package. (cmd)
October 25, 2018 6 Initial Disclosures by Aiesha Callahan.(cmd)
October 24, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Aiesha Callahan re #2 Order; USM 285, Summons, Initial Disclosures forms. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (cmd)
October 24, 2018 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Aiesha Callahan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmd) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 24, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis and allowing case to proceed without prepayment of costs or service fees. Plaintiff is directed to complete service forms and return to Clerk within 21 days from the entry date of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the undersigned if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 10/24/2018. Forms sent to party: USM 285; Summons; Initial Disclosures.(cmd)
October 23, 2018 5 NOTICE Of Filing Supplemental documentation referenced in Complaint by Aiesha Callahan re #3 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental documentation, #2 Proposed Summons) (cmd)
October 23, 2018 4 Letter from Aiesha Callahan (construed by the Clerk as a) MOTION to Expedite initial fee waiver processing, MOTION for Extension of Time 90 Day Right to Sue deadline by Aiesha Callahan. (Attachments: #1 Dismissal and Notice of Rights)(cmd)
October 23, 2018 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (eop)
October 19, 2018 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Aiesha Callahan. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summon(s))(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Callahan v. Emory Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emory Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: John Shiver Snelling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aiesha Callahan
Represented By: Thomas F. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?