Bermudez v. U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust et al
Plaintiff: Carlos A. Bermudez
Defendant: Fay Servicing, LLC and U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust
Case Number: 1:2018cv05018
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE Of Filing Notice of Removal by Carlos A. Bermudez. (rjs)
November 28, 2018 Submission of #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (rjs)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Fay Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust. (Chaness, Bret)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 Answer and Objection (construed by the Clerk as a) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Carlos A. Bermudez. (rjs)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 Objection (construed by the Clerk as a) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Carlos A. Bermudez. (rjs)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Fay Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Chaness, Bret)
November 2, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Carlos A. Bermudez re #4 Notice to Pro Se Parties. (jpa)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro Se Plaintiffs signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 11/1/18. (jpa)
November 1, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Carlos A. Bermudez re #3 Order. (rjs)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER (found in the #3 Order) denying as moot #2 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/1/2018. (rjs)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. As this case involves an alleged wrongful foreclosure, the Court REFERS this matter to a magistrate judge for determination of pretrial matters. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/1/2018. (rjs)
October 31, 2018 Submission of #1 Notice of Removal with TRO and Injunctive Relief and #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for an Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and for an Interlocutory Injunction by Carlos A. Bermudez. (originally filed in Superior Court of Gwinnett County 8/29/2018) (rjs)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT with TRO and Injunctive Relief. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-8243196) filed by U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust, Fay Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" State Court Civil Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bermudez v. U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Kearstin Harumi Sale
Represented By: Bret Jacob Chaness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust
Represented By: Kearstin Harumi Sale
Represented By: Bret Jacob Chaness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos A. Bermudez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?