Chiu et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Man-Huei Chang and Kuo-Wei Chiu
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05058
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: Walter E Johnson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Set Deadlines: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 1/25/2019. (klb)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants answer due 1/25/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 12/20/18. (klb)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time File a Response by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Tate, William)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 11/9/18. (klb)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Order by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tate, William)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Tate, William)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and Interlocutory Injunction by Man-Huei Chang, Kuo-Wei Chiu. (Found in #1 Notice of Removal) (jpa) (Motion added per direction of WEJ chambers) (jpa).
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-8247421) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chiu et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Man-Huei Chang
Represented By: Richard W. Calhoun
Represented By: Benjamin Blake Hungerford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kuo-Wei Chiu
Represented By: Richard W. Calhoun
Represented By: Benjamin Blake Hungerford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: William Oxford Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?