Brown et al v. Kemp
Plaintiff: LaTosha Brown, Candace Fowler, Jennifer Ide, Chalis Montgomery and Katharine Wilkinson
Defendant: Hon. Brian Kemp and Brian Kemp
Case Number: 1:2018cv05121
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
November 30, 2018 Filing 17 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered terminating action. (ddm)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying as moot #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and directing the Clerk to terminate this action. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 11/30/18. (ddm)
November 8, 2018 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William M. Ray, II: Motion Hearing held on 11/8/2018. After discussions in Chambers with counsel for both parties, the Court recognized counsel for Defendant and accepted a copy of Mr. Kemp's letter of resignation to Governor Deal. Counsel for Plaintiffs acknowledged that this would resolve the case. The Court will direct a dismissal of this case tomorrow morning. (Attachments: #1 Letter of Resignation) (Court Reporter Wynette Blathers)(btql)
November 8, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Chris Harvey)(Correia, Cristina)
November 7, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell D. Willard on behalf of Brian Kemp (Willard, Russell)
November 7, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina Correia on behalf of Brian Kemp (Correia, Cristina)
November 7, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Ellen Cusimano on behalf of Brian Kemp (Cusimano, Angela)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Katharine Wilkinson, LaTosha Brown, Candace Fowler, Chalis Montgomery, Jennifer Ide. Brian Kemp waiver mailed on 11/7/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Sells, Bryan)
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger A. Chalmers on behalf of Brian Kemp (Chalmers, Roger)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by LaTosha Brown, Candace Fowler, Jennifer Ide, Chalis Montgomery, Katharine Wilkinson Of Related Case (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Michael)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Laurence Schwartztol. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 11/7/18. (ddm)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Jessica Marsden. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 11/7/18. (ddm)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Laurence Schwartztol Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8259114)by LaTosha Brown, Candace Fowler, Jennifer Ide, Chalis Montgomery, Katharine Wilkinson. (Moore, Michael)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Jessica Marsden Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8259090)by LaTosha Brown, Candace Fowler, Jennifer Ide, Chalis Montgomery, Katharine Wilkinson. (Moore, Michael)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER scheduling a hearing regarding the #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order for Thursday, November 8, 2018, at 9:45 am, in Courtroom 1705. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve this Order upon Defendant. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 11/7/18. (ddm)
November 7, 2018 Submission of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, to District Judge William M Ray II. (ddm)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by LaTosha Brown, Candace Fowler, Jennifer Ide, Chalis Montgomery, Katharine Wilkinson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Jessica Marsden, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ddm)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Katharine Wilkinson, LaTosha Brown, Candace Fowler, Chalis Montgomery, Jennifer Ide. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8257658) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Brian Kemp
Represented By: Roger A. Chalmers
Represented By: Angela Ellen Cusimano
Represented By: Cristina Correia
Represented By: Russell D. Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kemp
Represented By: Roger A. Chalmers
Represented By: Angela Ellen Cusimano
Represented By: Cristina Correia
Represented By: Russell D. Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaTosha Brown
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Represented By: Charles W. Byrd
Represented By: Wade H. Tomlinson, III
Represented By: Caroline Gray McGlamry
Represented By: Michael J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Fowler
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Represented By: Charles W. Byrd
Represented By: Wade H. Tomlinson, III
Represented By: Caroline Gray McGlamry
Represented By: Michael J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Ide
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Represented By: Charles W. Byrd
Represented By: Wade H. Tomlinson, III
Represented By: Caroline Gray McGlamry
Represented By: Michael J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chalis Montgomery
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Represented By: Charles W. Byrd
Represented By: Wade H. Tomlinson, III
Represented By: Caroline Gray McGlamry
Represented By: Michael J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katharine Wilkinson
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Represented By: Charles W. Byrd
Represented By: Wade H. Tomlinson, III
Represented By: Caroline Gray McGlamry
Represented By: Michael J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?