Griffin v. Walmart

Plaintiff: Robustiano Griffin
Defendant: Walmart
Case Number: 1:2018cv05125
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart.(Hill, Robert)
December 4, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Robustiano Griffin re #23 Order. (ddm)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER approving #22 Defendant's Notice of Substitution of Counsel and withdrawing Defendant's Arkansas Defense Counsel. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 12/4/18. (ddm)
November 30, 2018 Filing 22 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Robert Benjamin Hill replacing attorney Jacob McElroy; Bryce G. Crawford and Karen P. Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Robert)
November 7, 2018 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Western; Case Number 5:18-cv-05120. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 7, 2018 Filing 20 OPINION and ORDER granting #18 Motion to Transfer and TRANSFERRING CASE to District of Northern Georgia. Docket Sheet and case documents sent to receiving court. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 7, 2018. (src) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 11/7/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #18 MOTION to Transfer Case by Walmart. (Freeman, Karen) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 11/7/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Transfer Case by Walmart. (Freeman, Karen) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 11/7/2018.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 17 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks: Case Management Hearing held on 10/11/2018. (Dana Hayden-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in Fayetteville-Room 509) (slc) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 11/7/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob McElroy on behalf of Walmart. (McElroy, Jacob) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 11/7/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #12 Motion to Attend Initial Scheduling Conference by Telephone. The Court's policy is that pro se litigants must attend in person the Court's Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference, where the issues and defenses in the case will be discussed, discovery procedures and Court rules explained, and the trial date and other important deadlines considered. Requiring pro se litigants to appear in person for this conference is necessary in order to best facilitate the Court's management of the case. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 21, 2018. (ee) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 11/7/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 14 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Walmart. (Crawford, Bryce) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 11/7/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #12 MOTION to attend the Initial Scheduling Conference by telephone re #9 Initial Scheduling Order, by Robustiano Griffin. (tg) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 11/7/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to attend the Initial Scheduling Conference by telephone re #9 Initial Scheduling Order by Robustiano Griffin. (tg) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 11/7/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart. (Freeman, Karen) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 11/7/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 10 Docket Annotation of Mailing of Initial Scheduling Order #9 to non-ECF participant, Robustiano Griffin dated 8/13/18. (slc) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 11/7/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 10/11/2018 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/18/2018. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 13, 2018. (slc) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 11/7/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Walmart.(Crawford, Bryce) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 11/7/2018.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robustiano Griffin. Walmart served on 7/16/2018, answer due 8/6/2018. (lgd) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 11/7/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Walmart and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #5 Order Directing Service, #1 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent. (tg) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 11/7/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Walmart and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on July 3, 2018. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(tg) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 11/7/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit. Plaintiff is not incarcerated so no fee will be collected. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on June 29, 2018. (smg) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 11/7/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished. (tg) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 11/7/2018.]
June 25, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service. Motions referred to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann.(tg) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 11/7/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Robustiano Griffin. (tg) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 11/7/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Walmart, filed by Robustiano Griffin.(tg) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 11/7/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Walmart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robustiano Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart
Represented By: Robert Benjamin Hill
Represented By: Karen P. Freeman
Represented By: Bryce G. Crawford
Represented By: Jacob McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?