Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Huey Luey's Acworth, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Fuel Publishing, Inc., Welsh Witch Music, Crooked Chimney Music, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp., Songs of Universal, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. and Blues Traveler Publishing Corporation
Defendant: Huey Luey's Acworth, LLC and Richard Stoll
Case Number: 1:2018cv05159
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. Richard Stoll served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Covington, Troy)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. Huey Luey's Acworth, LLC served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Covington, Troy)
November 14, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Register of Copyrights re #5 A.O. Form 121 Copyright. (rjs)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (rjs)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blues Traveler Publishing Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Crooked Chimney Music, Inc., Fuel Publishing, Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Welsh Witch Music identifying Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.; Corporate Parent Vivendi S.A. for Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.; Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for Stone Diamond Music Corp.; Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Covington, Troy)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED AO 121 . (Covington, Troy)
November 13, 2018 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (rlb)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Huey Luey's Acworth, LLC and Richard Stoll. (Attachments: #1 Summons Richard Stoll)(rlb)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Crooked Chimney Music, Inc., Fuel Publishing, Inc., Welsh Witch Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Blues Traveler Publishing Corporation, Gold Hill Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8263039) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Huey Luey's Acworth, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gold Hill Music, Inc.
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fuel Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welsh Witch Music
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crooked Chimney Music, Inc.
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stone Diamond Music Corp.
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blues Traveler Publishing Corporation
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huey Luey's Acworth, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?