Lundy v. Housing Authority of DeKalb County et al
Plaintiff: Lela Lundy
Defendant: Eugene Walker and Housing Authority of DeKalb County
Case Number: 1:2018cv05162
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 Withdrawal of Motion #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lela Lundy. (Burgess, Margaret)
November 19, 2018 Clerks Notation re #7 Leave of Absence November 12-30, 2018 and December 24-January 11, 2019 by Catherine Gibson McCauley. Judge Thrash will not require an appearance by C. McCauley on these dates. (ss)
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lela Lundy. Housing Authority of DeKalb County waiver mailed on 11/13/2018, answer due 1/14/2019; Eugene Walker waiver mailed on 11/13/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Siegel, Lindsey) Answer Due Date Added on 11/16/2018 (sap).
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): November 12-30, 2018 and December 24-January 11, 2019 by Catherine Gibson McCauley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Pending Cases)(McCauley, Catherine)
November 13, 2018 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Hearing re: NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2018 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Counsel for plaintiff has advised that there is no need for hearing.(ss)
November 9, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2018 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Counsel for plaintiff are directed to notice defendants and defendants counsel of the hearing. (ss)
November 9, 2018 Submission of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (sap)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lela Lundy. (sap)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Eugene Walker. (sap)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 (WITHDRAWN ON 11/21/2018 PER #9 WITHDRAWAL) - IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED - MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Lela Lundy. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A: Declaration of Lela Lundy, #3 Exhibit B: Declaration of Laura Wells) (sap) Modified on 11/23/2018 (sap).
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Lela Lundy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING the Plaintiff's #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/9/2018. (sap)
November 9, 2018 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller for IFP Determination. (sap)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lela Lundy. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #3 Brief in Support of Motion, #4 Exhibit A: Declaration of Lela Lundy, #5 Exhibit B: Declaration of Laura Wells, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Certificate of Interested Persons, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(sap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundy v. Housing Authority of DeKalb County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Authority of DeKalb County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lela Lundy
Represented By: Lindsey Meredith Siegel
Represented By: Margaret Anne Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?