The Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. et al v. Crittenden et al
Plaintiff: The Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. and AFG Group Inc
Defendant: Samuel Tillman, Ben Satterfield, Anthony Lewis, John Mangano, Robyn A. Crittenden, Beauty Baldwin, Alice O'Lenick, Stephen Day, Leona Perry, Baoky Vu and Michael Coveny
Intervenor Defendant: Georgia Republican Party, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05181
Filed: November 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE Supplemental Response to Request for Information #38 Response by Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield (Tyson, Bryan)
November 15, 2018 Filing 45 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT in Intervention by Georgia Republican Party, Inc.. Discovery ends on 4/15/2019.(Belinfante, Joshua) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs have shown that they are entitled to preliminary injunctive relief as to the absentee ballot (date of birth) issue. Plaintiffs have not shown that they are entitled to preliminary injunctive relief as to the absentee ballot (residence)issue and provisional ballot issues. The Court specifically DENIES Plaintiffs' request to extend the cure period and require the counting of out-of-county of residence provisional ballots.The Secretary of State is ENJOINED from certifying the State Election results until she has confirmed that each countys returns include the counts for absentee ballots where the birth date was omitted or incorrect. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/14/2018. (pdw)
November 14, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Bennett Davis Bryan on behalf of Michael Coveny, Anthony Lewis, Leona Perry, Samuel Tillman, Baoky Vu (Bryan, Bennett)
November 14, 2018 Filing 42 RESPONSE Submittal In Response to The Court's Request for Information re #34 Motion Hearing filed by Anthony Lewis, Leona Perry, Samuel Tillman, Baoky Vu and Michael Coveny. (Ware, R.) Modified on 11/16/2018 to edit filer information (rjs).
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and authorizes the filing of a brief of up to 30 pages in length. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/14/2018. (rjs)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Proposed Intervenor Defendant's #21 Motion to Intervene is GRANTED, and leave is GRANTED for them to intervene in the above-captioned case. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/14/2018. (rjs)
November 14, 2018 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Court's Request for Information re #34 Motion Hearing filed by Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield. (Tyson, Bryan)
November 13, 2018 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Plaintiffs informed the Court they are not opposed the Motion to Intervene as filed by the Georgia Republican Party #21 . Oral argument heard on Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO/preliminary injunction #4 . Order(s) to follow granting motion to intervene and ruling on motion for TRO. #4 Motion for TRO: TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. #21 Motion to Intervene: TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Court Reporter Jana Colter)(rjs)
November 13, 2018 Filing 37 CORRECTED NOTICE Of Filing Plaintiff's Response to Court's Request for Information at Emergency Hearing by AFG Group Inc, The Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. re #36 Notice of Filing, #34 Motion Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Sparks, Adam) Modified on 11/14/2018 to edit text (rjs).
November 13, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE Of Filing Plaintiff's Response to Court's Request for Information at Emergency Hearing by AFG Group Inc, The Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. re #34 Motion Hearing (Sparks, Adam)
November 13, 2018 Filing 35 RESPONSE General Submission in Response to Court's Request for Information #34 Motion Hearing filed by Georgia Republican Party, Inc. (Belinfante, Joshua)
November 13, 2018 Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Motion Hearing held on 11/13/2018 re #21 MOTION to Intervene filed by Georgia Republican Party, Inc.,and #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by The Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. and AFG Group Inc. Plaintiffs informed the Court they are not opposed the Motion to Intervene as filed by the Georgia Republican Party #21 . Oral argument heard on Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO/preliminary injunction #4 . Order(s) to follow granting motion tointervene and ruling on motion for TRO. (Court Reporter Jana Colter)(pdw)
November 13, 2018 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT of Chris Harvey by Robyn A. Crittenden. (Collins, William)
November 13, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina Correia on behalf of Robyn A. Crittenden (Correia, Cristina)
November 13, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by R. David Ware on behalf of Michael Coveny, Anthony Lewis, Leona Perry, Samuel Tillman, Baoky Vu (Ware, R.)
November 13, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions: the Court will hear argument and/or evidence on Plaintiffs' #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and the #21 MOTION to Intervene as filed by Georgia Republican Party, Inc. today, 11/13/2018, at 03:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
November 13, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by AFG Group Inc, Georgia Republican Party, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Judge May Order)(Kastorf, Kurt) Modified on 11/14/2018 to edit text (rjs).
November 13, 2018 Notification of Docket Correction re #14 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Robyn A. Crittenden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Collins, William) Modified on 11/13/2018 to correct text to pleading filed and add hyperlink (rjs). (rjs)
November 13, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE Of Filing Additional Declaration re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED by AFG Group Inc, The Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of John DeLapp)(Sparks, Adam) Modified on 11/14/2018 to edit text (rjs).
November 13, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Edward Lake on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Inc. (Lake, Brian)
November 13, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly K. Anderson on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Inc. (Anderson, Kimberly)
November 13, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by William Ryan Teague on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Inc. (Teague, William)
November 13, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Robert Russo, Jr on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Inc. (Russo, Vincent)
November 13, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Barrett Belinfante on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Inc. (Belinfante, Joshua)
November 13, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt G. Kastorf on behalf of AFG Group Inc, The Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (Kastorf, Kurt)
November 13, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE Of Filing Supplemental Filing In Support Of Intervenor Defendant Georgia Republican Partys Brief In Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Temporary Restraining Order by Georgia Republican Party, Inc. re #16 RESPONSE in Opposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Belinfante, Joshua) Modified on 11/13/2018 to edit text (rjs).
November 13, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Intervene with Brief In Support by Georgia Republican Party, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief [Exh 1], #2 Exhibit [Exh 2] Proposed defensive pleading, #3 Text of Proposed Order [Exh 3])(Belinfante, Joshua)
November 13, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Martin Sparks on behalf of AFG Group Inc, The Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (Sparks, Adam)
November 13, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED filed by Michael Coveny, Anthony Lewis, Leona Perry, Samuel Tillman, Baoky Vu. (Ware, R.) Modified on 11/13/2018 to edit text (bnw).
November 13, 2018 Filing 18 Electronic Summons Issued as to Beauty Baldwin, Michael Coveny, Robyn A. Crittenden, Stephen Day, Anthony Lewis, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Leona Perry, Ben Satterfield, Samuel Tillman and Baoky Vu. (Attachments: #1 Summons Anthony Lewis, #2 Summons Baoky Vu, #3 Summons Beauty Baldwin, #4 Summons Ben Satterfield, #5 Summons John Mangano, #6 Summons Leona Perry, #7 Summons Michael Coveny, #8 Summons Robyn A. Crittenden, #9 Summons Samuel Tillman, #10 Summons Stephen Day)(rjs)
November 13, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE Of Filing Plaintiffs' Additional Declarations in Support of Their Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction by AFG Group Inc re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED (Attachments: #1 Affidavit David J. Worley, #2 Affidavit Chrystian Woods, #3 Affidavit John DeLapp, #4 Affidavit Taylor Buettner)(Knapp, Halsey)
November 13, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED filed by Georgia Republican Party, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Belinfante, Joshua) Modified on 11/13/2018 to edit text (rjs).
November 13, 2018 Submission of #1 Complaint with TRO and Injunctive Relief, #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED and #15 Notice of Filing to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
November 13, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Robyn A. Crittenden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Collins, William) Modified on 11/13/2018 to correct text to pleading filed and add hyperlink (rjs).
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED filed by Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Lynn Ledford)(Tyson, Bryan)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by AFG Group Inc, The Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Knapp, Halsey) Modified on 11/14/2018 to edit text (rjs).
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyson, Bryan)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield (Tyson, Bryan)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William Coppedge Collins, Jr on behalf of Robyn A. Crittenden (Collins, William)
November 12, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE Of Filing Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Emergency Hearing by AFG Group Inc and The Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (rjs)
November 12, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Quinn Mulholland by AFG Group Inc and The Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (rjs)
November 12, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Rebecca DeHart by AFG Group Inc and The Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (rjs)
November 12, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Lauren Groh-Wargo by AFG Group Inc and The Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (rjs)
November 12, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Lona Tate by AFG Group Inc and The Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (rjs)
November 12, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Terekesha Graves by AFG Group Inc and The Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (rjs)
November 12, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Rachel Knowles by AFG Group Inc and The Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (rjs)
November 12, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED with Brief In Support by AFG Group Inc and The Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(rjs)
November 11, 2018 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Injunctive Relief (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8266051) filed by The Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. and AFG Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. et al v. Crittenden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Tillman
Represented By: R. David Ware
Represented By: Bennett Davis Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Satterfield
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Lewis
Represented By: R. David Ware
Represented By: Bennett Davis Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mangano
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn A. Crittenden
Represented By: William Coppedge Collins, Jr.
Represented By: Cristina Correia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beauty Baldwin
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice O'Lenick
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Day
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leona Perry
Represented By: R. David Ware
Represented By: Bennett Davis Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baoky Vu
Represented By: R. David Ware
Represented By: Bennett Davis Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Coveny
Represented By: R. David Ware
Represented By: Bennett Davis Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt G. Kastorf
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr.
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFG Group Inc
Represented By: Kurt G. Kastorf
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr.
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Georgia Republican Party, Inc.
Represented By: William Ryan Teague
Represented By: Kimberly K. Anderson
Represented By: Brian Edward Lake
Represented By: Joshua Barrett Belinfante
Represented By: Vincent Robert Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?