Merritt v. U.S. Auto Sales, Inc.
Plaintiff: Laura Merritt
Defendant: U.S. Auto Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05192
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. Auto Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Delnero, Daniel)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stefanie H. Jackman on behalf of U.S. Auto Sales, Inc. (Jackman, Stefanie)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Delnero on behalf of U.S. Auto Sales, Inc. (Delnero, Daniel)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, U.S. Auto Sales, Inc. Answer due 1/11/2019. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 12/19/2018. (tcc)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. Auto Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dillon, Trace)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Laura Merritt. (Gomez, Octavio)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Laura Merritt. U.S. Auto Sales, Inc. served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (Gomez, Octavio)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to U.S. Auto Sales, Inc. (rlb)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Laura Merritt. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8266427) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merritt v. U.S. Auto Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Merritt
Represented By: Octavio Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Auto Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L. Delnero
Represented By: Stefanie H. Jackman
Represented By: Trace Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?