Fabricant v. Priority Payment Systems Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Terry Fabricant
Defendant: Brian Jenkins, Priority Payment Systems, LLC, Priority Payment Systems Holdings, LLC and Assisted Alternative Merchant Strategies LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv05336
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Andrew Heidarpour. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/31/2018. (rjs)
December 29, 2018 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Terry Fabricant. Brian Jenkins served on 12/7/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Paronich, Anthony)
December 28, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew Heidarpour Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8328382). Attorney Andrew W. Heidarpour added appearing on behalf of Terry Fabricant (pmb)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Priority Payment Systems Holdings, LLC and Priority Payment Systems, LLC Answer due through and including January 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/18/2018. (rjs)
December 17, 2018 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Priority Payment Systems Holdings, LLC, Priority Payment Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Priority Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Priority Technology Holdings, Inc. for Priority Payment Systems Holdings, LLC, Priority Payment Systems, LLC. (Michell, David)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Priority Payment Systems Holdings, LLC, Priority Payment Systems, LLC. (Michell, David)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Anthony Paronich. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/14/2018. (rjs)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew Heidarpour Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8328382)by Terry Fabricant. (Koval, Steven)
December 11, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Anthony Paronich Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8294923). Attorney Anthony Paronich added appearing on behalf of Terry Fabricant (pmb)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Terry Fabricant. Priority Payment Systems, LLC served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Koval, Steven)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Terry Fabricant. Priority Payment Systems Holdings, LLC served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Koval, Steven)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brian Jenkins. (rjs)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Anthony Paronich Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8294923)by Terry Fabricant. (Koval, Steven)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Terry Fabricant for Defendant Brian Jenkins (Koval, Steven)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Assisted Alternative Merchant Strategies LLC, Priority Payment Systems Holdings, LLC, and Priority Payment Systems. (Attachments: #1 Summons Priority Payment Systems Holdings, LLC, #2 Summons Priority Payment Systems, LLC)(usw)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Terry Fabricant. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8284908) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(usw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fabricant v. Priority Payment Systems Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Fabricant
Represented By: Steven Howard Koval
Represented By: Anthony Paronich
Represented By: Andrew W. Heidarpour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Payment Systems, LLC
Represented By: David Gregory Michell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Payment Systems Holdings, LLC
Represented By: David Gregory Michell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assisted Alternative Merchant Strategies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?