Sanho Corporation v. Kaijet Technology International Limited, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sanho Corporation
Defendant: Kaijet Technology International Limited, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05385
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: The Court LIFTS the stay of this matter. The parties shall file, on or before February 1, 2019, a joint preliminary report and discovery plan, pursuant to Local Rule 16.1, NDGa Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/16/2019. (rlb)
January 16, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorneys Alexander Chen, Ali A. Aalaei and Benjamin Martin re #36 Order Lifting Stay. (rlb)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #29 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Ali Ari Aalaei. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/14/19. (jpa)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #30 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alexander Chen. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/14/19. (jpa)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin Martin. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/14/19. (jpa)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/18. (jpa)
January 14, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Benjamin Martin re #33 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jpa)
January 14, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ali Ari Aalaei re #35 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jpa)
January 14, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Alexander Chen re #34 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jpa)
January 11, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #29 APPLICATION for Admission of Ali Ari Aalaei Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8365995). Attorney Ali A. Aalaei added appearing on behalf of Sanho Corporation (pmb)
January 11, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #30 APPLICATION for Admission of Alexander Chen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8366013). Attorney Alexander Chen added appearing on behalf of Sanho Corporation (pmb)
January 11, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #31 APPLICATION for Admission of Benjamin Martin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8366028). Attorney Benjamin Martin added appearing on behalf of Sanho Corporation (pmb)
January 4, 2019 Filing 31 APPLICATION for Admission of Benjamin Martin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8366028)by Sanho Corporation. (Hill, Steven)
January 4, 2019 Filing 30 APPLICATION for Admission of Alexander Chen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8366013)by Sanho Corporation. (Hill, Steven)
January 4, 2019 Filing 29 APPLICATION for Admission of Ali Ari Aalaei Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8365995)by Sanho Corporation. (Hill, Steven)
January 4, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha Logan Decker on behalf of Sanho Corporation (Decker, Martha)
January 4, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven G. Hill on behalf of Sanho Corporation (Hill, Steven)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DIRECTING Mr. Aalaei and Mr. Chen, on or before 1/7/19, to apply for membership to the bar of the Northern District of Georgia and file their notices of appearance in this case, if they intend on remaining counsel of record for Plaintiff. If Mr. Aalaei and Mr. Chen do not intend on remaining counsel in this matter, then Plaintiff must have an attorney who is a licensed member of the bar of this Court, file an appearance on the docket on or beforeJanuary 7, 2019. The Court STAYS all deadlines in this matter. The Court will enter an order resetting case deadlines after the issue of Plaintiff's representation is resolved. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/6/18. (jpa)
December 6, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ali A. Aalaei and Alexander Chen re #26 Order. (jpa)
November 27, 2018 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:18-cv-03150. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #18 Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer Venue. The hearing scheduled for 11/29/2018 is VACATED. The Clerk shall transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia and close this court's file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/23/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 23 ERRATA re #21 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Sanho Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PLAINTIFF SANHO CORPORATIONS [CORRECTED] OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT KAIJET TECHNOLOGY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(2) AND 12 (b)(6), OR TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a))(Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 11/9/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 22 REPLY (re #18 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint OR MOTION to Change Venue under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) ) filed byKaijet Technology International Limited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration os Shou Yuan Steven Lu)(Strickland, Andrew) (Filed on 11/1/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint OR MOTION to Change Venue under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) ) filed bySanho Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ali A. Aalaei In Support of Opposition, #2 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Chin In Support of Opposition)(Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 10/25/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Stipulation re #18 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint OR MOTION to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/17/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
September 17, 2018 ***Set/Reset Deadlines per ECF #20 Order as to #18 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint OR MOTION to Change Venue under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Responses due by 10/25/2018. Replies due by 11/1/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #18 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint OR MOTION to Change Venue under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Stipulation Modifying Briefing Schedule 11/29/18 Motion to Dismiss) filed by Sanho Corporation. (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 9/14/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint OR, MOTION to Change Venue under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Kaijet Technology International Limited, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 9/25/2018. Replies due by 10/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Shou Yuan Steven Lyu, #2 Exhibit 2: Declaration of Andrew G. Strickland, #3 Proposed Order)(Strickland, Andrew) (Filed on 9/11/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed bySanho Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E to First Amended Complaint)(Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 8/29/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
August 20, 2018 ***Set/Reset Deadlines per ECF #16 Order as to #14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution, Motion to Transfer Case. Responses due by 9/5/2018. Replies due by 9/12/2018. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Stipulation Requesting Order Enlarging Time to File Responses By 9/5/18 and Replies By 9/12/18. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/20/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution MOTION to Transfer Case Requesting Order Enlarging Time to File Responses By 9/5/18 and Replies By 9/12/18 (14-day extension of time) filed by Sanho Corporation. (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 8/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution , MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Georgia filed by Kaijet Technology International Limited, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/22/2018. Replies due by 8/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Strickland, Andrew) (Filed on 8/8/2018) Modified on 8/8/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendants to Answer Complaint. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/5/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline for Defendants to Answer Complaint filed by Kaijet Technology International Limited, Inc.. (Strickland, Andrew) (Filed on 7/3/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Strickland (Strickland, Andrew) (Filed on 7/3/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 6/28/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Sanho Corporation (CONSENT OR DECLINATION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION) (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 6/26/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sanho Corporation re #5 Summons Issued Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Kaijet Technologies (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 6/26/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kaijet Technology International Limited, Inc. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2018 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/8/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 5/25/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kaijet Technology International Limited, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12386258.). Filed bySanho Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - C to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 5/25/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/27/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanho Corporation v. Kaijet Technology International Limited, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaijet Technology International Limited, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Garrett Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanho Corporation
Represented By: Alexander Chen
Represented By: Steven G. Hill
Represented By: Martha Logan Decker
Represented By: Benjamin Martin
Represented By: Ali A. Aalaei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?