Clark et al v. Conway et al
Plaintiff: Kelda Lisette Gordon, Nicolas Stewart, Wali K. Bascoe, Dustin Cantrell, William Chadwick, Darce Stelly, Diione Clay, Devon Marion, Jacquelyn Glass, Devonte James, Shane Mattadeen, Michael Heacock, Marquise Conner, William Lagemann, Shawn Collins, Rahmeel Davis, Diara Hood, Sassia Lett, Justice Lamar Warren-Franklin, Hosea Scott, Donovan Lowe, D'Vonte Jordan, Joseph Kollman, Concetta Cautela, Kevin Wesley Anderson, Jeffrey Howard, Curtis Rogers, Curtis Hardy, Donald Michael Reeves, Quentin Kemp, Gowayne Laing, Sonia Cash, Gregory McCormick, Jamon O'Neil, Tshombe Davis, Devaughn Jones, Brandon Turner, Demetrius Harley, Shelby Clark, Corey Berry, Julian Williams, Ryan Long, Irene Handy, Brandon Haddock, Justin Owen, Rashida Womack, Xavier Daniels, Ivan Prokopovich, Clifford Rousseau, William Gerald Young, Mary Wilson, Alexander Henry, Darriell Cross, Markell Collins, Jonathan Riley, John Levi Cook, III, Nicole Smith, Chauncey McCalla, Natasha Henderson, Justin Duchatellier, Miguel Perez, Quincy Cantrell, Terry Smith, Melissa Ward, Patrick Bryan Echols, Stedric Brown, Rodolfo Lopez, Brandon Mahome, Mulugeta Ejigu, Larry Calhoun, Felicia Heiskell, Shannon Grose, James Gleaton, Bryan Bunyan and Mathias Nwagbara
Defendant: Lt. Col. Carl Sims and R.L. (Butch) Conway
Case Number: 1:2018cv05416
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' Answer or otherwise responsive pleading is due February 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/16/2019. (rjs)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by R.L. (Butch) Conway, Lt. Col. Carl Sims. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Thomas)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 1/21/19, 2/21/19-2/27/19, 3/4/19-3/11/19, by Angela C. Couch. (Couch, Angela)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by R.L. (Butch) Conway, Lt. Col. Carl Sims. All Defendants., WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by R.L. (Butch) Conway, Lt. Col. Carl Sims. All Defendants. (Mitchell, Thomas)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Sonia Cash, Larry Calhoun, Brandon Mahome, Demetrius Harley, Donald Michael Reeves, D'Vonte Jordan, Shawn Collins, Marquise Conner, Justice Lamar Warren-Franklin, Shannon Grose, Shane Mattadeen, Patrick Bryan Echols, Brandon Haddock, Rodolfo Lopez, Miguel Perez, Rahmeel Davis, Mulugeta Ejigu, Devaughn Jones, Quincy Cantrell, John Levi Cook, III, Felicia Heiskell, Devon Marion, Jeffrey Howard, Justin Owen, Darce Stelly, Jacquelyn Glass, William Chadwick, Devonte James, Natasha Henderson, Tshombe Davis, William Lagemann, Ivan Prokopovich, Kevin Wesley Anderson, Xavier Daniels, James Gleaton, William Gerald Young, Jonathan Riley, Rashida Womack, Quentin Kemp, Curtis Lee Rogers, Michael Heacock, Bryan Bunyan, Shelby Clark, Alexander Henry, Dustin Cantrell, Melissa Ward, Hosea Scott, Darriell Cross, Diara Hood, Diione Clay, Gowayne Laing, Mary Wilson, Markel Collins, Sassia Lett, Jamon O'Neil, Clifford Rousseau, Curtis Hardy, Julian Williams, Brandon Turner, Chauncey McCalla, Stedric Brown, Terry Smith, Kelda Lisette Gordon, Justin Duchatellier, Ryan Long, Mathias Nwagbara, Nicole Smith, Corey Berry, Gregory McCormick, Nicolas Stewart, Concetta D. Cautela, Joseph Kollman, Irene Handy, Wali K. Bascoe (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8296249). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(usw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark et al v. Conway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelda Lisette Gordon
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolas Stewart
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wali K. Bascoe
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Cantrell
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Chadwick
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darce Stelly
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diione Clay
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Marion
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Glass
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devonte James
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Mattadeen
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Heacock
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquise Conner
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lagemann
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Collins
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rahmeel Davis
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diara Hood
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sassia Lett
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justice Lamar Warren-Franklin
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hosea Scott
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donovan Lowe
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Vonte Jordan
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Kollman
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concetta Cautela
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Wesley Anderson
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Howard
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Rogers
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Hardy
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Michael Reeves
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quentin Kemp
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gowayne Laing
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Cash
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory McCormick
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamon O'Neil
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tshombe Davis
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devaughn Jones
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Turner
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Harley
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Clark
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Berry
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Williams
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Long
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Handy
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Haddock
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Owen
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashida Womack
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Daniels
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Prokopovich
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Rousseau
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Gerald Young
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Wilson
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Henry
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darriell Cross
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markell Collins
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Riley
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Levi Cook, III
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Smith
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chauncey McCalla
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Henderson
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Duchatellier
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Perez
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quincy Cantrell
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Smith
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Ward
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Bryan Echols
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stedric Brown
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Lopez
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Mahome
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mulugeta Ejigu
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Calhoun
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Heiskell
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Grose
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gleaton
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Bunyan
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathias Nwagbara
Represented By: John G. Cicala
Represented By: Alison Reich Spiers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Col. Carl Sims
Represented By: Thomas M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.L. (Butch) Conway
Represented By: Thomas M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?