Clark v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Phelicia B. Clark
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., MetroPCS Georgia, LLC, LG Electronics, Inc., LG Chem, Ltd. and LG Chem America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05574
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Orinda D Evans
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by LG Chem America, Inc. (Bibbins, Walter) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/25/2019 to Add Jury Demand (sap).
January 24, 2019 Submission of #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court and #15 First MOTION to Amend #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (sap)
January 15, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Phelicia B. Clark. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Affidavit of James Valbrun)(Valbrun, James)
January 10, 2019 Filing 17 WITHDRAWAL of Claim re #13 Amended Complaint by Phelicia B. Clark. (Valbrun, James)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER re #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 1/3/2019. (sap)
January 4, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION to Amend #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Phelicia B. Clark. (Valbrun, James)
December 31, 2018 Filing 14 Electronic Summons Issued as to LG Chem America, Inc. (sap)
December 28, 2018 Filing 13 (WITHDRAWN PER #17 ) AMENDED COMPLAINT against LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., MetroPCS Georgia, LLC, LG Electronics, Inc., LG Chem, Ltd., LG Chem America, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Phelicia B. Clark. (sap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 1/17/2019 (sap).
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 (FILED INCORRECTLY; SEE #13 FOR CORRECTED ENTRY) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Phelicia B. Clark.(Valbrun, James) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 12/31/2018 (sap).
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Phelicia B. Clark (Valbrun, James)
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 Initial Disclosures by MetroPCS Georgia, LLC.(Park, Arthur)
December 25, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Phelicia B. Clark. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit)(Valbrun, James)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 Initial Disclosures by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc..(Park, Arthur)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Park, Arthur)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by MetroPCS Georgia, LLC identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile USA, Inc., Corporate Parent T-Mobile South LLC, Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc., Other Affiliate TMobile Global Holding GMbH, Other Affiliate TMobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH, Other Affiliate Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V., and Other Affiliate Deutsche Telekom AG for MetroPCS Georgia, LLC. (Park, Arthur) Other Affiliate Deutsche Telekom AG Added on 12/18/2018 (sap).
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LG Electronics, Inc. for LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Park, Arthur)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Edward C. Bresee, Jr. and Arthur James Park replacing attorney Aaron Karl Block and Min Ji Kim. (Park, Arthur) Appearing and Withdrawing Attorneys Corrected on 12/17/2018 (sap).
December 10, 2018 Submission of #1 Notice of Removal for Review, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (eop)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by MetroPCS Georgia, LLC. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. Discovery ends on 5/6/2019. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by MetroPCS Georgia, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-8315734) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phelicia B. Clark
Represented By: James Konrad Valbrun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Edward Croxall Bresee, Jr.
Represented By: Arthur James Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetroPCS Georgia, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Karl Block
Represented By: Edward Croxall Bresee, Jr.
Represented By: Arthur James Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem America, Inc.
Represented By: John E. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Walter J. Bibbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?