Coming Clean, Inc. et al v. Servicemaster Residential/Commercial Services Limited Partnership
Plaintiff: ALE Enterprise, LLC and Coming Clean, Inc.
Defendant: Servicemaster Residential/Commercial Services Limited Partnership
Case Number: 1:2018cv05623
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Servicemaster Residential/Commercial Services Limited Partnership Answer due 2/28/2019. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 1/24/19. (bnw)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by ALE Enterprise, LLC, Coming Clean, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Peak's Motion to Seal)(Katz, Seth)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 FILED IN ERROR AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proof of Service SERVED 1/4/19, as to Servicemaster Res/Comm. (Katz, Seth) Modified on 1/9/2019 to edit text (bnw).
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING #3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of W. Michael Garner by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on December 31, 2018. (lwb)
December 27, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #3 APPLICATION for Admission of W. Michael Garner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8323887). Attorney W. Michael Garner added appearing on behalf of ALE Enterprise, LLC, Coming Clean, Inc. (pmb)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 12/12/2018. (btql)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission of W. Michael Garner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8323887) with Brief In Support by ALE Enterprise, LLC, Coming Clean, Inc.. (Katz, Seth)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Servicemaster Residential/Commercial Services Limited Partnership. (eop)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Coming Clean, Inc. and ALE Enterprise, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8320288) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coming Clean, Inc. et al v. Servicemaster Residential/Commercial Services Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALE Enterprise, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Michael Katz
Represented By: Seth Nathan Katz
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coming Clean, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Michael Katz
Represented By: Seth Nathan Katz
Represented By: W. Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servicemaster Residential/Commercial Services Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?