Hall et al v. Paul et al
Plaintiff: Lucy Hall, Mary Hall Freedom House, Inc., Freedom Village, LLC, Gwenlyncia Graham and Billie Pollard
Defendant: City of Sandy Springs, Georgia, Ginger Sottile, Russell K. Paul, Daniel W. Lee and William Riley
Case Number: 1:2018cv05651
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION to Stay All Discovery with Brief In Support by City of Sandy Springs, Georgia, Daniel W. Lee, Russell K. Paul, William Riley, Ginger Sottile. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weiss, Matthew)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT Motion to Dismiss #24 and #25 . Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 02/05/2019. (usw)
February 5, 2019 Filing 30 Instructions to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 2/4/19. (rsh)
February 4, 2019 Filing 29 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Freedom Village, LLC, Lucy Hall, Mary Hall Freedom House, Inc., Gwenlyncia Graham, Billie Pollard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Bloom, Simon) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #26 Motion for Extension of Time re #24 First MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall have through and including 2/4/19 to respond. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 1/25/2019. (usw)
January 25, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan T. Pumpian on behalf of Freedom Village, LLC, Gwenlyncia Graham, Lucy Hall, Mary Hall Freedom House, Inc., Billie Pollard (Pumpian, Ryan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Freedom Village, LLC, Gwenlyncia Graham, Lucy Hall, Mary Hall Freedom House, Inc., Billie Pollard. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Pearson, Andrea)
January 14, 2019 Filing 25 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Brief In Support by Daniel W. Lee, Russell K. Paul, William Riley, Ginger Sottile. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Individual Defendants Motion to Dismiss)(Maine, Dana)
January 14, 2019 Filing 24 First MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by City of Sandy Springs, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 - Washington Road LLC Order, #3 Exhibit 2 - Hall Motion to Stay)(Maine, Dana) Modified on 1/15/2019 to correct document description(usw).
January 14, 2019 Filing 23 RE-DOCKETED WITH CORRECTIONS BY ATTORNEY IN #24 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Brief In Support by City of Sandy Springs, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Washington Road Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Hall Motion to Stay)(Maine, Dana) Modified on 1/15/2019 (usw).
January 14, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #18 Notice of Appearance. Modified on 1/14/2019 to add Matthew M. Weiss as counsel for defendants. (usw)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for Extension of Time until 1/14/2019 for Russell K. Paul, Daniel W. Lee, City of Sandy Springs, Georgia, Ginger Sottile, and William Riley to Answer #1 Complaint. The Court instructs the parties to refer to Judge Battens Instructions to Parties and Counsel in the future. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 1/10/2019. (adg)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The City shall have a page limitation of 30 pages for its Motion to Dismiss Brief. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 1/10/2019. (adg)
January 10, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Brief In Support by City of Sandy Springs, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Weiss, Matthew)
January 8, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION (Joint) for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by City of Sandy Springs, Georgia, Daniel W. Lee, Russell K. Paul, William Riley, Ginger Sottile. (Maine, Dana) Modified on 1/10/2019 (adg).
January 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Kristin Maine and Matthew M. Weiss on behalf of City of Sandy Springs, Georgia, Daniel W. Lee, Russell K. Paul, William Riley, Ginger Sottile (Maine, Dana) Modified on 1/14/2019 to add counsel.(usw).
January 3, 2019 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed by Freedom Village, LLC, Lucy Hall, Mary Hall Freedom House, Inc., Gwenlyncia Graham, Billie Pollard. William Riley served on 12/19/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. (Pearson, Andrea)
January 3, 2019 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed by Freedom Village, LLC, Lucy Hall, Mary Hall Freedom House, Inc., Gwenlyncia Graham, Billie Pollard. Daniel W. Lee served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Pearson, Andrea)
January 3, 2019 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by Freedom Village, LLC, Lucy Hall, Mary Hall Freedom House, Inc., Gwenlyncia Graham, Billie Pollard. City of Sandy Springs, Georgia served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Pearson, Andrea)
January 3, 2019 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Freedom Village, LLC, Lucy Hall, Mary Hall Freedom House, Inc., Gwenlyncia Graham, Billie Pollard. Ginger Sottile served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Pearson, Andrea)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Freedom Village, LLC, Lucy Hall, Mary Hall Freedom House, Inc., Gwenlyncia Graham, Billie Pollard. Russell K. Paul served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Pearson, Andrea)
December 19, 2018 Refund in the amount of $400.00 has been processed, effective 12/19/2018 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 Electronic Summons Issued as to Daniel W. Lee, Russell K. Paul, William Riley and Ginger Sottile. (Main Document: Summons Riley 1) (Attachments: #1 Summons Riley 2, #2 Summons Paul 1, #3 Summons Paul 2, #4 Summons Sottile 1, #5 Summons Sottile 2, #6 Summons Lee 1, #7 Summons Lee 2)(jlm)
December 17, 2018 Clerks Approval re #11 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
December 14, 2018 Filing 11 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number 113E-8322695. (Bloom, Simon)
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Freedom Village, LLC, Gwenlyncia Graham, Lucy Hall, Mary Hall Freedom House, Inc., Billie Pollard (Bloom, Simon)
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Freedom Village, LLC, Gwenlyncia Graham, Lucy Hall, Mary Hall Freedom House, Inc., Billie Pollard (Bloom, Simon)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Freedom Village, LLC, Gwenlyncia Graham, Lucy Hall, Mary Hall Freedom House, Inc., Billie Pollard (Bloom, Simon)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Freedom Village, LLC, Gwenlyncia Graham, Lucy Hall, Mary Hall Freedom House, Inc., Billie Pollard (Bloom, Simon)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Freedom Village, LLC, Gwenlyncia Graham, Mary Hall Freedom House, Inc., Billie Pollard (Bloom, Simon)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Freedom Village, LLC, Gwenlyncia Graham, Lucy Hall, Mary Hall Freedom House, Inc., Billie Pollard (Bloom, Simon)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Freedom Village, LLC, Gwenlyncia Graham, Lucy Hall, Mary Hall Freedom House, Inc., Billie Pollard (Bloom, Simon)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Freedom Village, LLC, Gwenlyncia Graham, Lucy Hall, Mary Hall Freedom House, Inc., Billie Pollard (Bloom, Simon)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to City of Sandy Springs, Georgia. (eop) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct Issued Date (eop).
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Lucy Hall, Freedom Village, LLC, Mary Hall Freedom House, Inc., Gwenlyncia Graham and Billie Pollard. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8322826) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A - 2018 Business Occupational Tax Certificate, #2 Exhibit -B - Zoning Certification, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summon(s))(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. Paul et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Hall
Represented By: Simon Howard Bloom
Represented By: Andrea Pearson
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Hall Freedom House, Inc.
Represented By: Simon Howard Bloom
Represented By: Andrea Pearson
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom Village, LLC
Represented By: Simon Howard Bloom
Represented By: Andrea Pearson
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwenlyncia Graham
Represented By: Simon Howard Bloom
Represented By: Andrea Pearson
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie Pollard
Represented By: Simon Howard Bloom
Represented By: Andrea Pearson
Represented By: Ryan T. Pumpian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sandy Springs, Georgia
Represented By: Dana Kristin Maine
Represented By: Matthew Michael Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginger Sottile
Represented By: Dana Kristin Maine
Represented By: Matthew Michael Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell K. Paul
Represented By: Dana Kristin Maine
Represented By: Matthew Michael Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel W. Lee
Represented By: Dana Kristin Maine
Represented By: Matthew Michael Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Riley
Represented By: Dana Kristin Maine
Represented By: Matthew Michael Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?