Hirsch v. Sandra Rose LLC

Plaintiff: Steven Hirsch
Defendant: Sandra Rose LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv05766
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Clerks Notation re #10 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Sandra Rose LLC. Answer due 2/22/2019. The parties shall submit the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan on or before 3/24/19. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 1/22/19. (bnw)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons by Sandra Rose LLC. (Smithers, Roxann)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Roxann Sherri Smithers on behalf of Sandra Rose LLC (Smithers, Roxann)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Sandra Rose LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time for Answer)(Smithers, Roxann)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Steven Hirsch. Sandra Rose LLC served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address for Joel B. Rothman, counsel for Steven Hirsch (Rothman, Joel)
December 28, 2018 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 12/20/18. (bnw)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sandra Rose LLC. (usw)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (usw)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Steven Hirsch. (usw)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8334462) filed by Steven Hirsch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(usw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hirsch v. Sandra Rose LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Rose LLC
Represented By: Roxann Sherri Smithers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Hirsch
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?