Hirsch v. Core Communicators Broadcasting, LLC

Plaintiff: Steven Hirsch
Defendant: Core Communicators Broadcasting, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv05769
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Steven Hirsch. Core Communicators Broadcasting, LLC served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Core Communicators Broadcasting, LLC. (eop)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Steven Hirsch. (eop)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (eop)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Steven Hirsch. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8334473) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 -Article, #2 Exhibit -2 - Registration, #3 Exhibit -3 - Infringement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hirsch v. Core Communicators Broadcasting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core Communicators Broadcasting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Hirsch
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?