Martinka v. Narrative Content Group, LLC

Plaintiff: Paul Martinka
Defendant: Narrative Content Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv05770
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason D. Rosenberg on behalf of Narrative Content Group, LLC (Rosenberg, Jason)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant NCG to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until and including March 10, 2019. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 1/30/2019. (bnp)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Narrative Content Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilco, Michelle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Paul Martinka. Narrative Content Group, LLC served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
December 20, 2018 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons - OK per WMR (sll)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (usw)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Narrative Content Group, LLC. (usw)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paul Martinka. (usw)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8334481) filed by Paul Martinka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Infringement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(usw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinka v. Narrative Content Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Martinka
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Narrative Content Group, LLC
Represented By: Michelle Wood Wilco
Represented By: Jason D. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?