Andrew v. Steed Media Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jason Andrew
Defendant: Steed Media Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05783
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by Steed Media Group, Inc.. (Chapar, Albert)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Steed Media Group, Inc.. Discovery ends on 7/1/2019.(Chapar, Albert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Jason Andrew. Steed Media Group, Inc. served on 1/10/2019, answer due 1/31/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (usw)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Steed Media Group, Inc.. (usw)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jason Andrew. (usw)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8337440) filed by Jason Andrew. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(usw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrew v. Steed Media Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steed Media Group, Inc.
Represented By: Albert A. Chapar, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Andrew
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?