Stewart v. Amazon.com, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Stewart
Defendant: On the Go Express, LLC, Amazon Logistics, Inc. and Amazon.com, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv05807
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (bnp)
January 31, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (bnp)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Kyle Stewart (Drake, E.)
January 3, 2019 RETURN of #3 APPLICATION for Admission of Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8352844) to attorney for correction re: courts and local counsel. (pmb)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission of Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8352844)by Kyle Stewart. (Schalman-Bergen, Sarah)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to On the Go Express, LLC. (bnp)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kyle Stewart. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8339301) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stewart Opt In Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Amazon.com, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: On the Go Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Stewart
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen
Represented By: Ryan Allen Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?