Robinson v. Alterra Home Loans et al

Plaintiff: Katherine P. Robinson
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, Alterra Home Loans, Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation, First Guaranty Mortgage Corporation and Venta Financial Group Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv05811
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
0 Judge: Timothy C Batten
1 Judge: Christopher C Bly
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Katherine P. Robinson re #20 Order. (jtj)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART #11 and #12 Motions for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions to Dismiss. The deadline for Plaintiff to file responses to the motions to dismiss filed by the Alterra Defendants and Defendants Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC and First Guaranty Mortgage Corp. is extended through and including March 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 2/08/2019. (jtj)
January 25, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Alterra Home Loans. (Arefin, Dewan)
January 24, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation identifying Corporate Parent RoundPoint Financial Group, Inc. for Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation.(Walsh, Sarah-Nell)
January 24, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A to Brief)(Walsh, Sarah-Nell)
January 24, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by First Guaranty Mortgage Corporation, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC. (Flynn, Steven)
January 23, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Katherine P. Robinson re #15 Order on Motion to Stay. (usw)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #9 and #10 Motions to Stay Discovery pending the Court's ruling on the motions to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 1/22/2019. (usw)
January 22, 2019 Submission of #10 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (usw)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 Initial Disclosures by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation.(Walsh, Sarah-Nell)
January 17, 2019 Submission of #9 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (usw)
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Katherine P. Robinson. Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. (tcc)
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 PRO SE MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Katherine P. Robinson. (tcc)
January 15, 2019 Filing 11 PRO SE MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Katherine P. Robinson. (tcc)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines with Brief In Support by Alterra Home Loans. (Arefin, Dewan)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines with Brief In Support by First Guaranty Mortgage Corporation, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief MTS Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Flynn, Steven)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by First Guaranty Mortgage Corporation, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief MTD Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A)(Flynn, Steven)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by First Guaranty Mortgage Corporation, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC. (Flynn, Steven)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alterra Home Loans identifying Corporate Parent Alterra Group, LLC for Alterra Home Loans. (Arefin, Dewan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT (See #6 for complete document) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alterra Home Loans identifying Corporate Parent Alterra Group, LLC for Alterra Home Loans. (Arefin, Dewan) Modified on 12/27/2018 (jlm).
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Alterra Home Loans. (Arefin, Dewan)
December 26, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Katherine P. Robinson re #3 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (rsh)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation Answer due 1/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 12/21/18. (rsh)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Sarah-Nell)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation, First Guaranty Mortgage Corporation, Venta Financial Group Inc, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC and Alterra Home Loans. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-8339606) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 12/21/2018 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Alterra Home Loans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC
Represented By: Steven J. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alterra Home Loans
Represented By: Dewan Sharmin Arefin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Sarah-Nell Walsh
Represented By: Ashley S. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Guaranty Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Steven J. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venta Financial Group Inc
Represented By: Dewan Sharmin Arefin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine P. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?