Miller v. Par North America et al

Plaintiff: Cathi Miller
Defendant: Jane Doe, James Burns, Par North America, Connect 1 Recovery, LLC and American Credit Acceptance, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv05814
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
0 Judge: Janet F King
1 Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) WITHDRAWING 4 Standing Order. This case is before Magistrate Judge Janet F. King for all pretrial matters and the parties will be subject to Judge King's case management requirements. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 1/3/19. (hfm)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Cathi Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to Section 1915(a) and the plaintiff shall be allowed to proceed with this action without payment of the filing fees associated with commencing a civil lawsuit. Counsel has signed the complaint, thereby representing that plaintiff's claim is not frivolous. Therefore, this action shall proceed as any other civil action. Counsel for plaintiff shall be charged with effecting service of process upon Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 12/21/2018. (bdb)
December 21, 2018 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis for consideration, to Magistrate Judge Janet F. King. (usw)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cathi Miller. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(usw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Par North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connect 1 Recovery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Credit Acceptance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathi Miller
Represented By: Ralph S. Goldberg
Represented By: Laurene C. Cuvillier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?