Durmic v. State Farm Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Damir Durmic
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Co.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05892
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Damir Durmic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(dgr)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF Compliance re #3 Order filed by Damir Durmic. (bdb)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Of Filing by State Farm Insurance Co. (Broder, Karl)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by State Farm Insurance Co.. (Broder, Karl)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Damir Durmic. State Farm Insurance Co. served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (bnw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Damir Durmic. State Farm Insurance Co. served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. (bdb)
December 31, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Damir Durmic re #3 Order. (bdb)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II (J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 12/31/2018. (bdb)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to State Farm Insurance Co. (dgr)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Damir Durmic. (Filing fee $400, receipt number GAN200004982) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durmic v. State Farm Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damir Durmic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Co.
Represented By: Karl Patrick Broder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?