Luc v. Korean Air Lines Co., LTD et al

Plaintiff: Lam Luc
Defendant: Korea Airport Services Co LTD, Bradcal, Inc., Korean Air Catering Center and Korean Air Lines Co., LTD
Case Number: 1:2018cv05900
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 28 Cross MOTION for Leave to File the Late Filing of Korean Air's Answer to the First Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Korean Air Lines Co., LTD. (Attachments: #1 Brief Korean Air Lines Co., Ltd's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike, And, Alternatively, In Support of its Cross-Motion for Leave Allowing The Late Filing of Korean Air's Answer to the First Amended Complaint, #2 Declaration of Robert W. Fisher in Support, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Robert W. Fisher - Complaint, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Robert W. Fisher - Answer, #5 Exhibit C - First Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Robert W. Fisher - Answer to First Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit E to Declaration of Robert W. Fisher - Declaration of Andrew J. Harakas)(Fisher, Robert) Text modified on 2/22/2019 (btql).
February 21, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Strike #17 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Korean Air Lines Co., LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert W. Fisher in Support of It's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike And Alternatively, In Support of Its Cross-Motion for Leave Allowing the Late Filing of Korean Air's Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Robert W. Fisher - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Robert W. Fisher - Answer, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Robert W. Fisher - First Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Robert W. Fisher - Answer to First Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Robert W. Fisher - Declaration of Andrew J. Harakas)(Fisher, Robert)
February 21, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Fisher on behalf of Korean Air Lines Co., LTD (Fisher, Robert)
February 21, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery of Plaintiff Lam Luc's Third Requests to Produce Documents and Third Requests for Admission to Defendant Korean Air Lines Co., Ltd. by Lam Luc.(Bold, Fredric)
February 19, 2019 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Korea Airport Services Co LTD. (btql)
February 19, 2019 Clerks Notation re #22 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
February 18, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Strike #17 Answer to Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Lam Luc. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A - Feb 12, 2019 407 PM EST Email from N. Ramachandrappa, #3 Exhibit B - Defendant Korean Air Lines Co.'s Initial Disclosures, #4 Exhibit C - Feb 08, 2019 307PM EST Email from N. Ramachandrappa, #5 Exhibit D - Feb 08, 2019 323 PM EST Email from A. Harakas, #6 Exhibit E - Feb 08, 2019 323 PM EST Email from A. Harakas)(Ramachandrappa, Naveen)
February 18, 2019 Filing 22 Amended Certificate of Interested Persons by Lam Luc. (Ramachandrappa, Naveen)
February 15, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of Korean Air's Notice of Deposition of Lam Luc by Korean Air Lines Co., LTD.(Bauer, James)
February 15, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of Defendant Korean Air Lines, Co., Ltd.'s First Requests to Produce Documents to Plaintiff Lam Luc by Korean Air Lines Co., LTD.(Bauer, James)
February 15, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of Defendant Korean Air Lines Co., Ltd's First Interrogatories to Plaintiff Lam Luc by Korean Air Lines Co., LTD.(Bauer, James)
February 13, 2019 Clerks Notation re #18 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
February 12, 2019 Filing 18 Amended Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Korean Air Lines Co., LTD identifying Other Affiliate Hanjin Group, Other Affiliate Korean NPS for Korean Air Lines Co., LTD. (Bauer, James)
February 12, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant Korean Air's ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Korean Air Lines Co., LTD.(Bauer, James) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 4, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of 1st And 2nd Discovery Requests To Defendant Korean Air Lines Co., Ltd by Lam Luc.(Ramachandrappa, Naveen) Modified on 2/5/2019 to remove all cap (btql).
February 4, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Bradcal, Inc. (btql)
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE Of Filing State Court Materials Omitted From Defendant Korean Air Lines Co., Ltd.'s Notice of Removal by Lam Luc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service on Bradcal, Inc., #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service on Korean Air Lines Co., Ltd., #3 Exhibit C - Order Appointing International Process Server)(Ramachandrappa, Naveen)
February 1, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default with Brief In Support by Lam Luc. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service of Bradcal, Inc., #3 Exhibit 2 - Fulton State Court Docket)(Ramachandrappa, Naveen)
January 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James Bauer on behalf of Korean Air Lines Co., LTD (Bauer, James)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #10 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 10/4/2019. Motions for summary judgment due by 11/4/2019. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/30/2019. (btql)
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures by Korean Air Lines Co., LTD.(Bauer, James)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Korean Air Lines Co., LTD. (Bauer, James)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Service of Initial Disclosures by Lam Luc (Ramachandrappa, Naveen)
January 28, 2019 Clerks Notation re #8 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by Lam Luc. (Ramachandrappa, Naveen)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Fredric Joseph Bold, Jr on behalf of Lam Luc (Bold, Fredric)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Naveen Ramachandrappa on behalf of Lam Luc (Ramachandrappa, Naveen)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT LAM LUC against Bradcal, Inc., Korea Airport Services Co LTD, Korean Air Catering Center, Korean Air Lines Co., LTDwith Jury Demand filed by Lam Luc.(Carson, Sammie) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/8/19. (jpa)
January 4, 2019 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
January 3, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant Korean Air Lines Co., Ltd.'s ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Plaintiff's Complaint) by Korean Air Lines Co., LTD. Discovery ends on 6/3/2019.(Bauer, James) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Korean Air Lines Co., LTD. (bnp)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Korean Air Lines Co., LTD. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-8353925) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Bradcal, Inc. Consent to Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luc v. Korean Air Lines Co., LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Korea Airport Services Co LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradcal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Korean Air Catering Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Korean Air Lines Co., LTD
Represented By: Andrew J. Harakas
Represented By: James Bauer
Represented By: Robert W. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lam Luc
Represented By: Sammie David Carson, Jr.
Represented By: Fredric Joseph Bold, Jr.
Represented By: Naveen Ramachandrappa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?