Liles v. Georgia Republican Party Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Liles
Defendant: Kemp for Governor, Inc. and Georgia Republican Party Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00151
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 16 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 29 - April 14, 2019, May 17 - May 29, 2019, July 1 - July 7, 2019, August 30 - September 13, 2019, November 24 - December 6, 2019, December 20 - January 8, 2020, by David M. Lilenfeld. (Lilenfeld, David)
February 28, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings with Brief In Support by Georgia Republican Party Inc., Kemp for Governor, Inc.. (Lilenfeld, David)
February 19, 2019 Received 1 thumb drive re #14 Notice of Filing Electronic Media. (btql)
February 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE Of Filing Electronic Media by Georgia Republican Party Inc., Kemp for Governor, Inc. re #13 Answer to Complaint, (Lilenfeld, David) Text modified on 2/20/2019 (btql).
February 19, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Georgia Republican Party Inc., Kemp for Governor, Inc.. Discovery ends on 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Video Entitled Abrams Too Extreme For Georgia), #2 Exhibit B (Screenshots of Video Entitled Abrams Too Extreme For Georgia))(Lilenfeld, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Georgia Republican Party Inc. and Kemp for Governor, Inc.'s Answers due 2/19/2019. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/4/2019. (btql)
February 4, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Georgia Republican Party Inc., Kemp for Governor, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Russo, Vincent)
February 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Lilenfeld on behalf of Georgia Republican Party Inc., Kemp for Governor, Inc. (Lilenfeld, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer Complaint by Georgia Republican Party Inc., Kemp for Governor, Inc.. (Russo, Vincent)
February 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Robert Russo, Jr on behalf of Georgia Republican Party Inc., Kemp for Governor, Inc. (Russo, Vincent)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Kevin D. Liles. Kemp for Governor, Inc. served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Kevin D. Liles. Georgia Republican Party Inc. served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
January 11, 2019 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/10/2019. (btql)
January 10, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #4 A.O. Form 121 Copyright. (bnp)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (bnp)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Georgia Republican Party Inc. and Kemp for Governor, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Kemp for Governor, Inc.)(bnp)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kevin D. Liles. (bnp)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kevin D. Liles. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8372710) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Article, #3 Exhibit 3 - Infringement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liles v. Georgia Republican Party Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Liles
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kemp for Governor, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Lilenfeld
Represented By: Vincent Robert Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Republican Party Inc.
Represented By: David M. Lilenfeld
Represented By: Vincent Robert Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?