Robin Warren Properties, LLC v. Smith
Plaintiff: Robin Warren Properties, LLC
Defendant: Michelle D. Smith
Case Number: 1:2019cv00214
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION OF FILING ACCEPTANCE from DeKalb County Magistrate Court re #11 Electronic Remand. (bnp)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to DeKalb County Magistrate Court re #10 Remand Order. (Attachments: #1 Filing Receipt (Status: Submitting)) (bnp)
February 11, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (bnp)
February 11, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michelle D. Smith re #10 Order. (bnp)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting #5 Final Report and Recommendation as the Opinion of this Court. This action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County. In so holding, Defendant Smith's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction #8 and subsequent rescission of the motion #9 are rendered MOOT. The Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 2/11/2019. (bnp)
February 5, 2019 Submission of #3 MOTION to Disqualify Judge, #5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, to District Judge William M Ray II. (jpa)
January 31, 2019 Submission of the Emergency #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and #9 MOTION to Rescind the #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to District Judge William M Ray II. (aaq)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 (Rescission construed by the Clerk as a) MOTION to Rescind the #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michelle D. Smith. (aaq)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Robin Warren Properties, LLC. (aaq)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 Additional Salient Document to the #2 Notice of Removal by Michelle D. Smith. (aaq)
January 17, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michelle D. Smith re #5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #6 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (bnp)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Service of #5 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 1/17/2019. (bnp)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 01/17/2019 within the #5 R&R. (bnp)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: RECOMMENDING that this action, #2 Notice of Removal, be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference of this case to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 01/17/2019. (bnp)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE re #3 MOTION to Disqualify Judge FOUND WITHIN THE #2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Originally filed in DeKalb County Magistrate Court on 12/21/2018.) filed by Robin Warren Properties, LLC. (bnp)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Disqualify Judge Gary LeShaw FOUND WITHIN THE #2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Originally filed in DeKalb County Magistrate Court on 12/20/2018.) by Michelle D. Smith. (bnp)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Michelle D. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
January 16, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (eop)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Michelle D. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robin Warren Properties, LLC v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Warren Properties, LLC
Represented By: John Richards Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?