Holt v. DH Hospitality, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dakota Holt
Defendant: MCIXII, LLC and DH Hospitality, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00241
Filed: January 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer is due 3/25/2019. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 2/19/19. (bnw)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, as to both Defendants by Dakota Holt. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ehrlich, Craig)
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Dakota Holt. DH Hospitality, Inc. served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Ehrlich, Craig)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by MCIXII, LLC. (Beggs, George)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by George Phillip Beggs on behalf of MCIXII, LLC (Beggs, George)
January 28, 2019 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Dakota Holt. (Ehrlich, Craig)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 1/16/19. (bnw)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to DH Hospitality, Inc., MCIXII, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons DH Hospitality Inc)(bnw)
January 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dakota Holt.(Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8382021) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holt v. DH Hospitality, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota Holt
Represented By: Craig J. Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCIXII, LLC
Represented By: George Phillip Beggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DH Hospitality, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?