Coface North America Insurance Company v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Coface North America Insurance Company
Defendant: James Wendell Davis, III and John Does 1-50
Case Number: 1:2019cv00242
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 29 Initial Disclosures by J. Davis Attorney at Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E)(Winks, Tiffany)
March 7, 2019 Submission of #28 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
March 6, 2019 Filing 28 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Coface North America Insurance Company. (Freeman, Christopher)
March 6, 2019 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by James Wendell Davis, III by James Wendell Davis, III.(Winks, Tiffany)
March 5, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Initial Disclosures by Coface North America Insurance Company. (Freeman, Christopher)
February 28, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by Coface North America Insurance Company Certificate of Compliance (Freeman, Christopher)
February 27, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by James Wendell Davis, III Certificate of Compliance re Standing Order in Cases Proceeding Before the Honorable Amy Totenberg (Ware, R.)
February 22, 2019 Filing 23 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 1-5, 2019, May 6-10, 2019, by Christopher B. Freeman. (Freeman, Christopher)
February 20, 2019 Submission of #15 MOTION to Dismiss, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bdb)
February 19, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint filed by James Wendell Davis, III. (Ware, R.)
February 14, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint filed by Coface North America Insurance Company. (Freeman, Christopher)
February 12, 2019 Filing 20 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Proceedings held on 2/4/2019, before Judge Amy Totenberg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shannon R. Welch, RMR, CRR, Telephone number 404-215-1383. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (srw)
February 8, 2019 Filing 19 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 5/22/19 - 6/7/19, by R. David Ware. (Ware, R.)
February 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by William Richard Story on behalf of James Wendell Davis, III (Story, William)
February 4, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Totenberg: Denying #2 Motion for TRO; denying #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and denying #11 Motion to Expedite. Evidentiary Hearing held on 2/4/2019. (Court Reporter Shannon Welch)(bdb)
February 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany R. Winks on behalf of Coface North America Insurance Company (Winks, Tiffany)
February 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by James Wendell Davis, III. (Ware, R.)
February 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Consent to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant James Wendell Davis, III by James Wendell Davis, III (Richard W. Hendrix & Emma Cecil) (Cecil, Emma)
February 4, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction James Wendell Davis, III's Amendment to His Response to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Opposition Thereto filed by James Wendell Davis, III. (Cecil, Emma)
February 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by R. David Ware on behalf of James Wendell Davis, III (Ware, R.)
February 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Coface North America Insurance Company. (Freeman, Christopher)
January 31, 2019 Submission of #4 Order, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bdb)
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma R. Cecil on behalf of James Wendell Davis, III (Cecil, Emma)
January 23, 2019 NOTICE RESCHEDULING HEARING by docket entry only. Evidentiary Hearing re-set for 2/4/2019 at 02:30 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2308 before Judge Amy Totenberg. (hfm)
January 22, 2019 NOTICE SCHEDULING HEARING by docket entry only: Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/30/2019 at 02:30 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2308 before Judge Amy Totenberg. (hfm)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Wayne Hendrix on behalf of James Wendell Davis, III (Hendrix, Richard)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Wayne Hendrix on behalf of James Wendell Davis, III (Hendrix, Richard)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Opposition filed by James Wendell Davis, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 1, #2 Exhibit No. 2)(Hendrix, Richard)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: Guidelines to Parties and Counsel in Cases Proceeding before the Honorable Amy Totenberg. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 1/22/19. (jpa)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Coface North America Insurance Company. James Wendell Davis, III served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Freeman, Christopher)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs counsel is DIRECTED to serve Defendant with the Complaint and attachments, Motion for TRO, and this Order NO LATER THAN 9:00 AM Friday, January 18, 2019, or if service is not effectuated by that time, Plaintiffs counsel is DIRECTED to certify in writing any efforts made to give notice of the Motion for TRO and forthcoming hearing. Defendant is DIRECTED to file a response to Plaintiffs Motion for TRO by 3:00 PM Tuesday, January 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 1/15/19. (hfm)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to James Wendell Davis, III. (bdb)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Coface North America Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(bdb)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Coface North America Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8382496) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coface North America Insurance Company v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coface North America Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher B. Freeman
Represented By: David Barret Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Wendell Davis, III
Represented By: Richard Wayne Hendrix
Represented By: R. David Ware
Represented By: Emma R. Cecil
Represented By: William Richard Story
Represented By: Tiffany R. Winks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?