Jones-Shaw v. American Express Company

Plaintiff: Felicia L. Jones-Shaw
Defendant: American Express Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00255
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
0 Judge: John K Larkins
1 Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Felicia L. Jones-Shaw re #4 Order, #2 Order ruling on IFP,. (jpa)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER giving the Plaintiff another opportunity to comply with the instructions in the 2/5/19 order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a copy of this order and a copy of the 2/5/19 order. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint no later than 3/2219. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 3/8/19. (jpa)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Felicia L. Jones-Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmd) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 5, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Felicia L. Jones-Shaw re #2 Order ruling on IFP. (cmd)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff leave to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Jones-Shaw is ORDERED to file, by February 26, 2019, an amended complaint that clearly sets forth her claims for relief and the relevant facts supporting those claims and otherwise complies with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8 and 10. Jones-Shaw is cautioned that, if she fails to comply with this Order, this action may be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins III on 2/5/2019. (cmd)
January 15, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (tcc)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Felicia L. Jones-Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones-Shaw v. American Express Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia L. Jones-Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?