Drake v. Bankhead Food Store, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Destiny L. Drake
Defendant: Bankhead Food Store, Inc and Rayhaan Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00258
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (bjh)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties have announced that this case has settled. The CourtDIRECTS the Clerk of Court to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE thiscase. The parties shall file a dismissal or other filing disposing of thiscase upon finalization of the settlement. If settlement negotiations fail,the parties shall promptly move to reopen the case. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/12/19. (bjh)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Destiny L. Drake (Ehrlich, Craig)
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Destiny L. Drake. Bankhead Food Store, Inc served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. (Ehrlich, Craig)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Destiny L. Drake. Rayhaan Enterprises, Inc. served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Ehrlich, Craig)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Destiny L. Drake. (Ehrlich, Craig) Modified on 1/24/2019 to edit text (rlb).
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER for civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/18. (jpa)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Bankhead Food Store, Inc and Rayhaan Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Rayhaan Enterprises)(rlb)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Destiny L. Drake. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8385251) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drake v. Bankhead Food Store, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankhead Food Store, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rayhaan Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Destiny L. Drake
Represented By: Craig J. Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?