Waters v. Hill and Hashmi, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Allison Waters
Defendant: Hill and Hashmi, LLC, Henderson Partners, L.L.C. and 3H Improvement LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00284
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 11 Electronic Summons Issued as to 3H Improvement LLC. (bdb)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Allison Waters (Ehrlich, Craig)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3H Improvement LLC filed by Allison Waters.(Ehrlich, Craig) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
January 31, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) With Prejudice as to Defendant Hilland Hashmi, LLC only. (bdb)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Hill and Hashmi, LLC filed by Allison Waters (Ehrlich, Craig)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Allison Waters. Hill and Hashmi, LLC served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. (Ehrlich, Craig)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by Allison Waters. (Ehrlich, Craig)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Compliance re: Standing Order in Cases Proceeding Before the Honorable Amy Totenberg by Allison Waters re #4 Order (Ehrlich, Craig)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Guidelines to Parties and Counsel in Cases proceeding before The Honorable Amy Totenberg. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 1/22/19. (jpa)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Henderson Partners, L.L.C.. (eop)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Hill and Hashmi, LLC. (eop)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Allison Waters. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8388095) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waters v. Hill and Hashmi, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill and Hashmi, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henderson Partners, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3H Improvement LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Waters
Represented By: Craig J. Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?