Swafford v. SV Property Management Inc.

Plaintiff: Dustin Swafford
Defendant: SV Property Management Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00289
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SV Property Management Inc. Answer due 3/25/2019. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/25/2019. (rjs)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Dustin Swafford. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ehrlich, Craig)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES.(pdw)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Dustin Swafford. SV Property Management Inc. served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Ehrlich, Craig)
January 30, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Dustin Swafford. (Ehrlich, Craig)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to SV Property Management Inc.. (eop)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dustin Swafford. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8388254) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swafford v. SV Property Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SV Property Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Swafford
Represented By: Craig J. Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?