United States of America v. $84,000.00 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $84,000.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 1:2019cv00308
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 03/08/2019. (Brown, Michael)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 4, 2019, March 5, 2019, March 6, 2019, March 7, 2019, March 8, 2019 and March 9, 2019, by Michael John Brown. (Brown, Michael)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent To Venus Demond Scott (Brown, Michael)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent To Kirk Dwayne Jones (Brown, Michael)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Anita Scott at Texas Address (Brown, Michael)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Anita Scott at Louisiana Address (Brown, Michael)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $84,000.00 in United States Currency. (sap)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by the USM on 2/5/2019 for $84,000.00 in United States Currency. (sap)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM for $84,000.00 in UNITED STATES CURRENCY by United States of America. (sap)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $84,000.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $84,000.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael John Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?