Meduty v. USA Drivers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Prince Amun-Ra Hotep Meduty
Defendant: Rose Griffith and USA Drivers, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00356
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Submission of #9 EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (rlb)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Prince Amun-Ra Hotep Meduty. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(rlb)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT ( Discovery ends on 7/25/2019.), COUNTERCLAIM against Prince Amun-Ra Hotep Meduty by Rose Griffith, USA Drivers, Inc..(Hand, Kerry) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Prince Amun-Ra Hotep Meduty. Rose Griffith served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (rlb)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Prince Amun-Ra Hotep Meduty. USA Drivers, Inc. served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (rlb)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/18. (jpa)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael L. Brown for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-00356-MLB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 1/30/2019. (tcc)
January 30, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Prince Amun-Ra Hotep Meduty re #5 Order. (jpa)
January 30, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Prince Amun-Ra Hotep Meduty re #4 Order Reassigning Case. (tcc)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Rose Griffith. (eop)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to USA Drivers, Inc.. (eop)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Prince Amun-Ra Hotep Meduty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 3/12/2019 to note plaintiff did pay the $400 filing fee on 1/22/19, receipt # GAN100109546 (ddm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meduty v. USA Drivers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Griffith
Represented By: Kerry Eston Hand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Drivers, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry Eston Hand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prince Amun-Ra Hotep Meduty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?