Bowden et al v. Voya Financial Advisors, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lois Bowden, John Carrick IRA, Roy M. Roberts IRA, Jeffrey M. Knowles, Sr., Thomas G. Rountree, Jr., Estate of Emmie R. Charping, Sara B. Foster, Joe A. Rice IRA, Louann S. Grimsley, Amy W. Smith ROTH IRA, Robin Rountree Tuten and Homer E. Foust IRA
Defendant: Voya Financial Advisors, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00447
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Clerks Notation re #6 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by Amy W. Smith ROTH IRA, Lois Bowden, Estate of Emmie R. Charping, Sara B. Foster, Louann S. Grimsley, Homer E. Foust IRA, Joe A. Rice IRA, John Carrick IRA, Jeffrey M. Knowles, Sr, Thomas G. Rountree, Jr, Roy M. Roberts IRA, Robin Rountree Tuten. (Bain, David)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING Voya Financial Advisors, Inc., #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Plead, or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint. Answer due 3/29/2019. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 02/15/2019. (usw)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Voya Financial Advisors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meeks, Jo)
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Louann S. Grimsley, Amy W. Smith ROTH IRA, John Carrick IRA, Sara B. Foster, Homer E. Foust IRA, Roy M. Roberts IRA, Joe A. Rice IRA, Lois Bowden, Robin Rountree Tuten, Thomas G. Rountree, Jr, Jeffrey M. Knowles, Sr, Estate of Emmie R. Charping. Voya Financial Advisors, Inc. served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019. (Bain, David)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Voya Financial Advisors, Inc. (aaq)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8409204) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaq) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowden et al v. Voya Financial Advisors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Bowden
Represented By: David Andrew Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Carrick IRA
Represented By: David Andrew Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy M. Roberts IRA
Represented By: David Andrew Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey M. Knowles, Sr.
Represented By: David Andrew Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas G. Rountree, Jr.
Represented By: David Andrew Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Emmie R. Charping
Represented By: David Andrew Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara B. Foster
Represented By: David Andrew Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe A. Rice IRA
Represented By: David Andrew Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louann S. Grimsley
Represented By: David Andrew Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy W. Smith ROTH IRA
Represented By: David Andrew Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Rountree Tuten
Represented By: David Andrew Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homer E. Foust IRA
Represented By: David Andrew Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voya Financial Advisors, Inc.
Represented By: David Andrew Bain
Represented By: Jo Lanier Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?