U.S. Security Associates, Inc. v. Schwartz
Plaintiff: U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
Defendant: Kristopher Schwartz
Case Number: 1:2019cv00567
Filed: February 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 30 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Defendant's Statement of Jurisdictional Objections)(McCart, Wes)
March 18, 2019 Filing 29 Court Reporter Acknowledgment re: #26 Transcript Order Form filed by Kristopher Schwartz. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 19-10618-F. Transcript is required. Court Reporter: David A. Ritchie. Satisfactory financial arrangements completed. Transcript due by 4/17/2019. (pjm)
March 7, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Kristopher Schwartz. Discovery ends on 8/5/2019.(McGoff, Michael) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 5, 2019 Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Persons by Kristopher Schwartz. (Gabriel, Charles)
March 5, 2019 Set Deadline re: #16 Notice of Appeal: Financial Arrangements due on 3/18/2019. (pjm)
March 4, 2019 Set Financial Arrangements due date deadline re: #26 Transcript Order Form. Financial Arrangements due on 3/18/2019.(kac)
March 4, 2019 Filing 26 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM for proceedings held on 2/13/2019 (Motion TRO Hrg) before Judge Hon. Steve C. Jones, re: #16 Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter: David A. Ritchie. (Gabriel, Charles) Modified on 3/5/2019 to update text (pjm).
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Zachary M Mattison. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/28/2019. (rlb)
February 28, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #24 APPLICATION for Admission of Zachary M Mattison Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Zachary M. Mattison added appearing on behalf of Kristopher Schwartz (cdg)
February 28, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorney Zachary M. Mattison re #25 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rlb)
February 25, 2019 Filing 24 APPLICATION for Admission of Zachary M Mattison Pro Hac Vice by Kristopher Schwartz. (Gabriel, Charles)
February 25, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Change of Address for Charles D. Gabriel, counsel for Kristopher Schwartz (Gabriel, Charles)
February 25, 2019 Filing 22 Withdrawal of Motion #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kristopher Schwartz filed by Kristopher Schwartz. (Gabriel, Charles)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - Kristopher Schwartz Answer due 3/7/2019. The parties are advised that all future joint/consent motions must be accompanied by a proposed order. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/25/2019. (pdw)
February 22, 2019 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kristopher Schwartz. (Gabriel, Charles) Modified on 2/25/2019 to correct text from all capitals and correct MOTION type (rjs).
February 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Kristopher Schwartz . (Gabriel, Charles) Modified on 2/25/2019 (rjs).
February 22, 2019 RETURN of #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Zachary M Mattison Pro Hac Vice to attorney for correction re: local counsel's address. (pmb)
February 21, 2019 Filing 19 USCA Order DENYING Appellant's Motion for a Partial Stay of an Injunction re: #16 Notice of Appeal filed by Kristopher Schwartz. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 19-10618-F. (kac)
February 20, 2019 Filing 17 USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to 11th Circuit re: #16 Notice of Appeal filed by Kristopher Schwartz. (kac)
February 20, 2019 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #16 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
February 19, 2019 Filing 18 USCA Acknowledgment of #16 Notice of Appeal filed by Kristopher Schwartz. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 19-10618-F. (kac)
February 19, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #14 Order on Motion for TRO,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Expedite,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,,, by Kristopher Schwartz. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 113E-8459328. Transcript Order Form due on 3/5/2019 (Gabriel, Charles)
February 19, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Zachary M Mattison Pro Hac Vice by Kristopher Schwartz. (Gabriel, Charles)
February 19, 2019 RETURN of #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Zachary M Mattison Pro Hac Vice to attorney for correction re: format. (pmb)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: U.S. Security Associates' #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Expedited Discovery, and Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is denied to the extent that it seeks expedited discovery in this case. The motion is granted to the extent that: 1. Defendant is enjoined and restrained from performing the same or substantially similar work as he performed for U.S. Security [Associates] (i.e. managing employees, developing business, negotiating contracts, and overseeing customer accounts relating to the provision of contract security services) for another security services provider within the geographic territory in which he worked for U.S. Security [Associates] at the time his employment ended; 2. Defendant is enjoined and restrained from directly or indirectly contacting, soliciting, or attempting to solicit business from U.S. Security [Associates] customers with whom [Defendant] had contact or learned confidential information about during his employment with U.S. Security [Associates]; 3. Defendant is enjoined and restrained from recruiting or hiring, attempting to recruit or hire, or soliciting in any way any employees of U.S. Security [Associates] with whom [Defendant] had contact or communications during the last two years of [Defendant's] employment with U.S. Security [Associates]; and 4. Defendant is enjoined and restrained from Using or disclosing information furnished to, obtained by, or created by [Defendant] during his employment with U.S. Security [Associates], including the names, addresses, and pricing information of U.S. Security [Associates] clients and prospects. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/15/2019. (rjs)
February 13, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Hearing held on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order [2-1]. Oral argument heard; matter taken under advisement by the Court with ruling to follow. #2 Motion for TRO: TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Court Reporter David Ritchie)(rjs)
February 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Charles McGoff on behalf of Kristopher Schwartz (McGoff, Michael)
February 13, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Declaration of Andi Chella, #2 Exhibit Second Declaration of Andi Chella, #3 Text of Proposed Order Temporary Restraining Order and Order for Expedited Discovery)(McCart, Wes)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Zachary M Mattison Pro Hac Vice by Kristopher Schwartz. (Gabriel, Charles)
February 12, 2019 RETURN of #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Zachary M Mattison Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8436956) to attorney for correction re: form. (pmb)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kristopher Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Schwartz, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Atty Mattison, #3 Exhibit ZMM Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit ZMM Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit ZMM Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit ZMM Exhibit D)(Gabriel, Charles)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Kristopher Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memoradum in Support, #2 Affidavit Client Declaration, #3 Affidavit Attorney Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exh A ZMM, #5 Exhibit Exh B ZMM, #6 Exhibit Exh C ZMM, #7 Exhibit Exh D ZMM)(Gabriel, Charles)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Zachary M Mattison Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8436956)by Kristopher Schwartz. (Gabriel, Charles)
February 7, 2019 Refund in the amount of $400.00 has been processed, effective 2/7/2019 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Resetting Hearing on Motion. The hearing on Plaintiff's #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION to Expedite Discovery and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is RESET for 2/13/2019 at 04:30 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1907. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/6/2019. (pdw)
February 6, 2019 Clerks Approval re #5 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number 113e-8425132. (McCart, Wes)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for THURSDAY, FEBRUARY, 7TH, 2019 AT 4:30 P.M. in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C. Jones. As no entry of appearance has yet been made by or on behalf of Defendant, counsel for Plaintiff is DIRECTED to serve Defendant with a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/4/2019. (rjs)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kristopher Schwartz. (rjs)
February 4, 2019 Submission of #1 Complaint and #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
February 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Expedited Discovery and Preliminary Injunction IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED with Brief In Support by U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Andi Chella in Support, #3 Counsel Certification in Support)(rjs).
February 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with TRO and INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8425132) filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Security Associates, Inc. v. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Evan Scott Weiss
Represented By: Wes Reid McCart
Represented By: Matthew D. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristopher Schwartz
Represented By: Zachary M. Mattison
Represented By: Michael Charles McGoff
Represented By: Charles D. Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?