Hooper v. Wilkie
Plaintiff: Sholanda Hooper
Defendant: Dr. David J. Shulkin and Sec. of VA Robert L. Wilkie
Case Number: 1:2019cv00617
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: John K Larkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Sholanda Hooper re #13 Order. (jta)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to file her amended complaint with the Clerks office no later than April 15, 2019. If she fails to comply with this Order, this action may be dismissed. It also appears that Plaintiff may be proceeding with the assistance of another person in this case. If that person is an attorney admitted to practice in this Court, she must make an appearance on Plaintiffs behalf. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 4/1/19. (jta)
March 8, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Don B. Long, III re #12 Order. (jpa)
March 8, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Sholanda Hooper re #12 Order and copy of Pro Se Employment Discrimination Form (jpa)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for More Definite Statement. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a copy of the Pro Se Employment Discrimination Complaint Form. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint by 3/29/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 3/7/19. (jpa)
March 5, 2019 Submission of #11 MOTION for More Definite Statement , to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (jpa)
February 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for More Definite Statement with Brief In Support by Robert L. Wilkie. (Williams, Samuel)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:18-cv-01419. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #6 MOTION to Transfer Venue. ORDER transferring case to the Northern District of Georgia; Original electronic record and copy of docket entries will be electronically sent to the Clerk of Court of the Northern District of Georgia 10 business days from this date. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 1/22/2019. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/5/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Sholanda Hooper. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/5/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing, on or before January 11, 2019, why the Court should not dismiss this case without prejudice for improper venue or transfer this case to a proper venue. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 12/21/2018. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/5/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by David J Shulkin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Long, Don) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/5/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: For good cause shown and with no opposition from the Plaintiff, the court GRANTS the "Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint." (Doc. 4). The Defendant's responsive pleading is now due on or before December 20, 2018. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 12/11/18. (MMW) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/5/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by David J Shulkin. (Long, Don) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/5/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sholanda Hooper. David J Shulkin served on 11/1/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/5/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to David J Shulkin, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, returned to Plaintiff for service on this the 28th day of September, 2018. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/5/2019.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David J Shulkin (Filing fee $ 400,receipt number ALND B4601091674), filed by Sholanda Hooper.(KEK) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooper v. Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. David J. Shulkin
Represented By: Don B. Long, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sec. of VA Robert L. Wilkie
Represented By: Samuel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sholanda Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?