United States of America v. $17,321.69 in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $3,714.50 in U.S. Currency, $8,888.18 in U.S. Currency, $100.00 in U.S. Currency [5488], $100.00 in U.S. Currency [5504], $100.00 in U.S. Currency [8827], $100.00 in U.S. Currency [7807], $100.00 in U.S. Currency [0720], $100.00 in U.S. Currency [3269], $3,780.57 in U.S. Currency, $100.00 in U.S. Currency [9850], $4,227.44 in U.S. Currency, $100.00 in U.S. Currency [7799], $920.17 in U.S. Currency, $100.00 in U.S. Currency [8532], $60,794.94 in U.S. Currency, $17,321.69 in U.S. Currency, $100.00 in U.S. Currency [3244], $100.00 in U.S. Currency [3251], $100.00 in U.S. Currency [0316], $100.00 in U.S. Currency [8524], $100.00 in U.S. Currency [0106], $5,908.99 in U.S. Currency, $100.00 in U.S. Currency [8516], $2,641.08 in U.S. Currency, $100.00 in U.S. Currency [5454], $2,125.83 in U.S. Currency and $100.00 in U.S. Currency [7781]
Case Number: 1:2019cv00686
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 32 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 3/27/2019. (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Decatur Medical Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Waterville Medical Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Washington Health Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Tualatin Medical Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Sussex Medical Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to St. Paul Medical Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Oklahoma Medical Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Newport Health Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to New York Health Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Murray Health Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Minneapolis Health Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Medical Equipment USA, Inc. (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Manchester Health Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Madison Medical Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Lincoln Medical Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Lansing Health Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Kansas Medical Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Hamilton Medical Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Great Falls Health Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Fort Lee Health Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Edina Medical Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Des Moines Medical Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Dane Health Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Clackamas Medical Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Charleston Medical Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Atlanta Medical Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Albuquerque Health Supplies (Sneed, Sekret)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed on 2/21/2019 for Arrest of $112,023.39 in funds. (rlb)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Warrant for Arrest in Rem by United States of America (rlb)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (rlb)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $17,321.69 in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $3,714.50 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,888.18 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $100.00 in U.S. Currency [5488]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $100.00 in U.S. Currency [5504]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $100.00 in U.S. Currency [8827]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $100.00 in U.S. Currency [7807]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $100.00 in U.S. Currency [0720]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $100.00 in U.S. Currency [3269]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $3,780.57 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $100.00 in U.S. Currency [9850]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,227.44 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $100.00 in U.S. Currency [7799]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $920.17 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $100.00 in U.S. Currency [8532]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $60,794.94 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $17,321.69 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $100.00 in U.S. Currency [3244]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $100.00 in U.S. Currency [3251]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $100.00 in U.S. Currency [0316]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $100.00 in U.S. Currency [8524]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $100.00 in U.S. Currency [0106]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,908.99 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $100.00 in U.S. Currency [8516]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,641.08 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $100.00 in U.S. Currency [5454]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,125.83 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $100.00 in U.S. Currency [7781]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sekret T. Sneed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?