Humphries v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Valeta Hampton Humphries
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00749
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth R. Hiller. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 4/10/19. (rlb)
February 22, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth R. Hiller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8456878). Attorney Kenneth R. Hiller added appearing on behalf of Valeta Hampton Humphries (pmb)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth R. Hiller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8456878)by Valeta Hampton Humphries. (Flynn, Kathleen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons Attorney General)(bnp)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Valeta Hampton Humphries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Counsel has signed the complaint, thereby representing that plaintiff's claim is not frivolous. Therefore, this action shall proceed as any other civil action. Counsel for plaintiff shall be charged with effecting service of process upon Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 2/15/2019. (bnp)
February 15, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (eop)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Valeta Hampton Humphries. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit -A, #3 Exhibit -B, #4 Exhibit -C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summon(s) -3)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphries v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valeta Hampton Humphries
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Flynn
Represented By: Kenneth R. Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?