Infinity Midway Manor, LLC v. Sutton

Plaintiff: Infinity Midway Manor, LLC
Defendant: Christopher Sutton
Case Number: 1:2019cv00756
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 Remark: Case ELECTRONICALLY transmitted to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County. (bnw)
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 REMAND LETTER as to the Clerk of the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County. (bnw)
March 1, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (bnw)
March 1, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Christopher Sutton re #11 Order. (bnw)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that Sutton's #5 objections are OVERRULED. The Court APPROVES AND ADOPTS the #3 Final Report and Recommendation as the judgment of the Court. The action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/1/19. (bnw)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court re: #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation filed by Christopher Sutton. (kac)
February 28, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Christopher Sutton re: #9 Order on Application to Appeal in forma pauperis. (kac)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING #7 Application to Appeal in forma pauperis. Further requests to proceed in forma pauperis should be directed by motion to the circuit court within 30 days pursuant to Fed.R.App.P.24. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 2/28/19. (kac)
February 28, 2019 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Order, Report and Recommendation, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #6 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to 11th Circuit re: #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Christopher Sutton. (kac) (kac).
February 28, 2019 Submission of #7 APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (kac)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis by Christopher Sutton. (kac)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation by Christopher Sutton. (kac)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 OBJECTIONS to #3 Report and Recommendation filed by Christopher Sutton. (ddm)
February 15, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Christopher Sutton re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (btql)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 2/15/2019. (btql)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER and FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the #2 Notice of Removal be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 2/15/2019. (btql)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Christopher Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 2/15/2019 within in the Final R&R. (btql)
February 15, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (rlb)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Petition for Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Infinity Midway Manor, LLC v. Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Infinity Midway Manor, LLC
Represented By: Randel Upton Self, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?