Mastermind Involvement Marketing, Inc. v. The Art Institute of Atlanta, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mastermind Involvement Marketing, Inc.
Defendant: The Art Institute of Virginia Beach, LLC, The Art Institute of Austin, Inc., Miami International University of Art & Design, Inc., The Art Institute of Dallas, Inc., The Art Institute of Tampa, Inc., The Art Institute of Houston, LLC, The Art Institute of San Antonio, Inc. and The Art Institute of Atlanta, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00839
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT (Discovery ends on 8/26/2019) and COUNTERCLAIM against Mastermind Involvement Marketing, Inc. by The Art Institute of Houston, LLC, The Art Institute of Atlanta, LLC, The Art Institute of San Antonio, Inc., The Art Institute of Virginia Beach, LLC, The Art Institute of Tampa, Inc., The Art Institute of Austin, Inc., Miami International University of Art & Design, Inc., The Art Institute of Dallas, Inc. (Feinberg, Alexander) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, All Defendants. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/13/19. (TWT)
March 12, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Miami International University of Art & Design, Inc., The Art Institute of Atlanta, LLC, The Art Institute of Austin, Inc., The Art Institute of Dallas, Inc., The Art Institute of Houston, LLC, The Art Institute of San Antonio, Inc., The Art Institute of Tampa, Inc., The Art Institute of Virginia Beach, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Feinberg, Alexander)
March 12, 2019 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed by Mastermind Involvement Marketing, Inc.. The Art Institute of Atlanta, LLC served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Schuh, Mathew)
March 4, 2019 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed by Mastermind Involvement Marketing, Inc.. The Art Institute of Virginia Beach, LLC served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Schuh, Mathew)
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by Mastermind Involvement Marketing, Inc.. The Art Institute of Tampa, Inc. served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Schuh, Mathew)
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Mastermind Involvement Marketing, Inc.. Miami International University of Art & Design, Inc. served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Schuh, Mathew)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Mastermind Involvement Marketing, Inc.. The Art Institute of San Antonio, Inc. served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Schuh, Mathew)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Mastermind Involvement Marketing, Inc.. The Art Institute of Houston, LLC served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Schuh, Mathew)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Mastermind Involvement Marketing, Inc.. The Art Institute of Dallas, Inc. served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Schuh, Mathew)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Mastermind Involvement Marketing, Inc.. The Art Institute of Austin, Inc. served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Schuh, Mathew)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Miami International University of Art & Design, Inc.. (eop)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Art Institute of Virginia Beach, LLC. (eop)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Art Institute of Tampa, Inc.. (eop)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Art Institute of San Antonio, Inc.. (eop)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Art Institute of Houston, LLC. (eop)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Art Institute of Dallas, Inc.. (eop)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Art Institute of Austin, Inc.. (eop)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Art Institute of Atlanta, LLC. (eop)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mastermind Involvement Marketing, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8458712) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mastermind Involvement Marketing, Inc. v. The Art Institute of Atlanta, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Art Institute of Virginia Beach, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Bunnen Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Art Institute of Austin, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Bunnen Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami International University of Art & Design, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Bunnen Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Art Institute of Dallas, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Bunnen Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Art Institute of Tampa, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Bunnen Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Art Institute of Houston, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Bunnen Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Art Institute of San Antonio, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Bunnen Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Art Institute of Atlanta, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Bunnen Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mastermind Involvement Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Mathew Anthony Schuh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?